|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1924 | 12/1924 | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6321 |
|||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1924 | 29/03/1924 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 1927 | 06/08/1927 | General | ||||
Gorton Works | 1930 | 01/1930 | General | ||||
Gorton Works | 07/1932 | 04/06/1932 | General | ||||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1934 | 09/1934 | General | ||||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1936 | 07/1936 | General | ||||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1938 | 08/1938 | General | ||||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1940 | 08/1940 | General | ||||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1943 | 21/08/1943 | 14 days | General | Boiler number 946 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1944 | 06/01/1945 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/02/1946 | 06/04/1946 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3323 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3702 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1948 | 18/05/1948 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3429 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63702 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/06/1950 | 05/08/1950 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 3410 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1952 | 16/08/1952 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 22285 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1954 | 11/09/1954 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 22276 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1956 | 13/10/1956 | 44 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22206 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1957 | 24/08/1957 | 27 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 09/09/1960 | 14/10/1960 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22214 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1685 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3729 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1924. Dep: ?/12/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6321 |
||
22/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/03/1924. Dep: 29/03/1924. | ||
29/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
05/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
07/12/1924 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1335 boiler fitted | ||
27/11/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1927. Dep: 06/08/1927. | ||
1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1930. Dep: ?/01/1930. | ||
07/01/1930 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1143 boiler fitted | ||
04/06/1932 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1125 boiler fitted | ||
07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/07/1932. Dep: 04/06/1932. | ||
08/12/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
29/12/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
14/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1934. Dep: ?/09/1934. | ||
07/09/1934 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1878 boiler fitted | ||
19/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
21/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
25/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1936. Dep: ?/07/1936. | ||
07/07/1936 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 811 boiler fitted | ||
07/08/1938 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1949 boiler fitted | ||
12/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1938. Dep: ?/08/1938. | ||
06/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1940. Dep: ?/08/1940. | ||
07/08/1940 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 804 boiler fitted | ||
25/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
31/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
10/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
08/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 946 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1944. Dep: 06/01/1945. | ||
22/05/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
04/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
27/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3323 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3702 |
||
14/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
12/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1948. Dep: 18/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3429 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63702 |
||
19/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1950. Dep: 05/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3410 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
17/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
28/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1952. Dep: 16/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22285 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1954. Dep: 11/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22276 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 31/08/1956. Dep: 13/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22206 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 29/07/1957. Dep: 24/08/1957. | ||
31/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
09/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1960. Dep: 14/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22214 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
19/09/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63702 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
16/03/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |