Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 132 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4263 Week
» 14433 Month
» 292229 Year
» 1176610 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1686 m/e 08/1918
LNER (1924) 6336   01/03/1924
LNER (1946) 3703   01/09/1946
BR 63703 w/e 14/10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/308/1918
O4/824/01/1953
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E105
Works Number 3730
To Service During 08/1918
Taken into Stock 01/03/1924
Withdrawal Sun 31/01/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 46 yrs , 6 mths

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to J Cashmore, Great Bridge 3/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 01/03/1924
DON Doncaster 24/03/1924
CLK Colwick 19/12/1930
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 24/11/1940
WFD Woodford Halse 01/02/1943
CLK Colwick 21/03/1943
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
ARD Ardsley 11/06/1944
MEX Mexborough 18/08/1946
40E Langwith Junction 02/07/1950
   Withdrawn 31/01/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 02/07/1950
WDN   w/e 31/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1962)
02/02/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1680)
06/12/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1098)
16/09/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1242)
22/10/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1413)
05/04/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3327)
12/07/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3302)
12/03/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3400)
23/06/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1070)
30/12/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1187)
06/10/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22116)
24/01/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28838)
21/04/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28381)
05/07/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28290)
05/07/1958 Water Treatment apparatus fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/02/1924 01/03/1924 22 days Heavy
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6336
 
Gorton Works 02/07/1926 16/07/1926 15 days General  
Gorton Works 26/01/1929 02/02/1929 8 days General
Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/11/1930 06/12/1930 8 days General
Boiler number 1098 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1933 16/09/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1242 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/10/1935 22/10/1935 6 days General
Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1938 05/04/1938 8 days General
Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1940 12/07/1940 14 days General
Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1943 12/03/1943 11 days General
Boiler number 3400 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1945 23/06/1945 41 days General
Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/11/1947 30/12/1947 38 days General
Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1950 06/10/1950 33 days General
Boiler number 22116 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63703
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1952 29/01/1952 7 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 05/12/1952 24/01/1953 51 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28838 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1953 16/01/1954 34 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 14/03/1955 21/04/1955 39 days General
Boiler number 28381 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1956 13/10/1956 30 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 20/11/1956 29/12/1956 40 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 13/02/1957 23/02/1957 11 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 22/05/1958 05/07/1958 45 days General
Boiler number 28290 (Diagram 100A)
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 
Gorton Works 10/09/1958 13/09/1958 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 28/11/1958 20/12/1958 23 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 25/01/1962 24/02/1962 31 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1686
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3730
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 01/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6336
   
01/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
01/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
24/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
02/07/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1926. Dep: 16/07/1926.    
26/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1929. Dep: 02/02/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15)
   
29/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1930. Dep: 06/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1098 (Diagram 15)
   
19/12/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
02/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1933. Dep: 16/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1242 (Diagram 15)
   
17/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1935. Dep: 22/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 15)
   
29/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1938. Dep: 05/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15)
   
29/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1940. Dep: 12/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 15)
   
24/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
01/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
02/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1943. Dep: 12/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3400 (Diagram 15)
   
21/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
11/06/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
14/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15)
   
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3703    
23/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1947. Dep: 30/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15)
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
04/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1950. Dep: 06/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22116 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63703
   
23/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/01/1952. Dep: 29/01/1952.    
05/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1952. Dep: 24/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28838 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/12/1953. Dep: 16/01/1954.    
14/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1955. Dep: 21/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28381 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/09/1956. Dep: 13/10/1956.    
20/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/11/1956. Dep: 29/12/1956.    
13/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/02/1957. Dep: 23/02/1957.    
22/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1958. Dep: 05/07/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28290 (Diagram 100A)
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
10/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/09/1958. Dep: 13/09/1958.    
28/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/11/1958. Dep: 20/12/1958.    
25/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/01/1962. Dep: 24/02/1962.    
31/01/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63703 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev