Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 710 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1657 Week
» 20439 Month
» 268732 Year
» 1153113 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1647 m/e 10/1918
LNER (1924) 6550   10/11/1928
LNER (1946) 3704   29/09/1946
BR 63704 m/e 30/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/210/1918
O4/805/12/1953
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E106
Works Number 3731
To Service During 10/1918
Taken into Stock 02/12/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sun 17/03/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 44 yrs, 5 mths , 15 dys

Notes
Notes Thornton shed 1/1/29: Side doors fitted
Into Doncaster for cutting up 19/8/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
THJ Thornton Junction 02/12/1928
LNG Langwith Junction 12/09/1943
MAR March 08/09/1944
CAM Cambridge 22/12/1947
MAR March 29/03/1948
36B Mexborough 28/10/1951
36D Barnsley 13/02/1955
41J Langwith Junction 29/11/1959
41F Mexborough 01/05/1960
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 09/07/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 17/03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC MAR March w/e 03/04/1948
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 36D Barnsley 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 14/05/1960
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 05/08/1961
WDN   17/03/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1418)
20/05/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1472)
11/05/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1377)
17/04/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3289)
20/05/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3370)
26/07/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3265)
11/09/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3240)
02/06/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3294)
10/11/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22129)
05/12/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28846)
10/08/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28323)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 28/07/1928 10/11/1928 106 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6550
 
Cowlairs Works 03/12/1928 11/12/1928 9 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 15/04/1931 16/05/1931 32 days General  
Gorton Works 18/04/1933 20/05/1933 33 days General
Boiler number C1472 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/04/1935 11/05/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1937 17/04/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 3289 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1939 20/05/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3370 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/07/1941 26/07/1941 11 days General
Boiler number 3265 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1943 11/09/1943 16 days General
Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1947 02/06/1947 45 days General
Boiler number 3294 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1950 10/11/1950 24 days General
Boiler number 22129 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/10/1953 05/12/1953 43 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28846 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1953 16/12/1953 9 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 06/07/1957 10/08/1957 36 days General
Boiler number 28323 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1961 28/09/1961 48 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 10/03/1962 17/03/1962 8 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1647
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3731
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
28/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1928. Dep: 10/11/1928.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6550
   
02/12/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ)    
02/12/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
03/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/12/1928. Dep: 11/12/1928.    
15/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1931. Dep: 16/05/1931.    
18/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1933. Dep: 20/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1472 (Diagram 15)
   
20/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1935. Dep: 11/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 15)
   
27/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1937. Dep: 17/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3289 (Diagram 15)
   
06/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3370 (Diagram 15)
   
16/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1941. Dep: 26/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3265 (Diagram 15)
   
27/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1943. Dep: 11/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 15)
   
12/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
08/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
29/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3704    
19/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1947. Dep: 02/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3294 (Diagram 15)
   
22/12/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
29/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
18/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1950. Dep: 10/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22129 (Diagram 15)
   
11/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 63704    
28/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
24/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1953. Dep: 05/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28846 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/12/1953. Dep: 16/12/1953.    
13/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
06/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1957. Dep: 10/08/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28323 (Diagram 100A)
   
29/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
01/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
09/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
12/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/08/1961. Dep: 28/09/1961.    
10/03/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/03/1962. Dep: 17/03/1962.    
18/03/1962 Sightings Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Gorton shed.   Link
17/03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63704 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev