Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1649 m/e 10/1918
LNER (1924) 6320   16/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3705   08/09/1946
BR 63705 w/e 23/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/310/1918
O4/519/08/1939
O4/706/12/1947
O4/802/08/1958
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E106
Works Number 3733
To Service During 10/1918
Taken into Stock 16/02/1924
Withdrawal Sun 14/04/1963 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 44 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 2/12/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 22/02/1924
ANN Annesley 21/04/1924
LNG Langwith Junction 05/09/1943
MAR March 07/09/1944
CAM Cambridge 22/12/1947
MAR March 29/03/1948
36A Doncaster 30/04/1950
39A Gorton 21/05/1950
38D Staveley (G.C.) 17/02/1952
   Withdrawn 14/04/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC MAR March w/e 03/04/1948
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 21/05/1950
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 23/02/1952
WDN   14/04/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1218)
27/12/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1155)
01/03/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1217)
20/05/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1885)
10/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 934)
10/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 940)
19/08/1939 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3651)
09/08/1941 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 639)
26/02/1944 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3655)
06/12/1947 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3667)
25/11/1950 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22309)
07/02/1953 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22303)
30/04/1955 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22305)
02/08/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28970)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/02/1924 16/02/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6320
 
Gorton Works 30/08/1924 27/12/1924 120 days General
Boiler number 1155 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1927 24/12/1927 50 days General  
Gorton Works 08/02/1930 01/03/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1217 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1933 20/05/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1885 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1935 10/08/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 934 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1937 10/07/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 940 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1939 19/08/1939 24 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/5
Boiler number 3651 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1941 09/08/1941 12 days General
Boiler number 639 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1944 26/02/1944 22 days General
Boiler number 3655 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 08/11/1947 06/12/1947 29 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3667 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 02/07/1949 23/07/1949 22 days Light Casual
After collision
Renumbered to BR 63705
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1950 25/11/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 22309 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 24/01/1953 07/02/1953 15 days General
Boiler number 22303 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1953 12/02/1953 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 02/04/1955 30/04/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 22305 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 02/05/1955 04/05/1955 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 22/12/1956 12/01/1957 22 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 07/06/1958 02/08/1958 57 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28970 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 13/08/1958 31/08/1958 19 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 10/02/1961 18/03/1961 37 days Light Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1649
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3733
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
02/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 16/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6320
   
16/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
22/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
21/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
30/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1924. Dep: 27/12/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1155 (Diagram 15)
   
05/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1927. Dep: 24/12/1927.    
08/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1930. Dep: 01/03/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1217 (Diagram 15)
   
06/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1933. Dep: 20/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1885 (Diagram 15)
   
20/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1935. Dep: 10/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 934 (Diagram 15)
   
26/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1937. Dep: 10/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 940 (Diagram 15)
   
27/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1939. Dep: 19/08/1939.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/5
Boiler number 3651 (Diagram 15A)
   
29/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1941. Dep: 09/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 639 (Diagram 15A)
   
05/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
05/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1944. Dep: 26/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3655 (Diagram 15A)
   
07/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
08/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3705    
08/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1947. Dep: 06/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3667 (Diagram 15D)
   
22/12/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
29/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
02/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/07/1949. Dep: 23/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
After collision
Renumbered to BR 63705
   
30/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
11/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1950. Dep: 25/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22309 (Diagram 15D)
   
17/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
24/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1953. Dep: 07/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22303 (Diagram 15D)
   
10/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1953. Dep: 12/02/1953.    
02/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1955. Dep: 30/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22305 (Diagram 15D)
   
02/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/05/1955. Dep: 04/05/1955.    
22/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/12/1956. Dep: 12/01/1957.    
07/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1958. Dep: 02/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28970 (Diagram 100A)
   
13/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/08/1958. Dep: 31/08/1958.    
10/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/02/1961. Dep: 18/03/1961.    
14/04/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63705 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev