Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 132 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4263 Week
» 14433 Month
» 292229 Year
» 1176610 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1650 m/e 10/1918
LNER (1924) 6319   09/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3706   30/06/1946
BR 63706 w/e 25/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/310/1918
O4/711/05/1940
O4/824/11/1956
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E106
Works Number 3734
To Service During 10/1918
Taken into Stock 09/02/1924
Withdrawal Sun 26/09/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Arnott Young (Parkgate)
Service Life 46 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Arnott Young, Parkgate, 11/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 13/02/1924
MEX Mexborough 24/10/1944
IMM Immingham 16/09/1945
GOR Gorton 12/05/1946
WFD Woodford Halse 18/08/1946
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
LNG Langwith Junction 20/02/1948
ANN Annesley 07/03/1948
39A Gorton 26/11/1950
38D Staveley (G.C.) 18/11/1951
38A Colwick 27/06/1954
38D Staveley (G.C.) 17/07/1955
41J Langwith Junction 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn 26/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 21/02/1948
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 13/03/1948
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) w/e 24/11/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 26/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1191)
04/07/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1145)
08/08/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1329)
14/08/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1238)
07/10/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1098)
30/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1275)
23/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 865)
11/05/1940 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3667)
07/10/1944 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3683)
28/12/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3670)
24/12/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3697)
21/07/1951 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22320)
08/08/1953 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22314)
03/02/1955 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22870)
24/11/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28813)
27/07/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28391)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/02/1924 09/02/1924 8 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6319
 
Gorton Works 29/04/1924 04/07/1924 67 days General
Boiler number 1145 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1927 05/09/1927 46 days General  
Gorton Works 11/05/1929 08/08/1929 90 days General
Boiler number 1329 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/07/1931 14/08/1931 35 days General
Boiler number 1238 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1933 07/10/1933 30 days General
Boiler number 1098 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/11/1935 30/11/1935 23 days General
Boiler number 1275 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1937 23/10/1937 23 days General
Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1940 11/05/1940 36 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3667 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 23/08/1942 26/09/1942 35 days General  
Gorton Works 08/09/1944 07/10/1944 30 days General
Boiler number 3683 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1946 28/12/1946 49 days General
Boiler number 3670 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1948 24/12/1948 33 days General
Boiler number 3697 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63706
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1951 21/07/1951 48 days General
Boiler number 22320 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 04/07/1953 08/08/1953 36 days General
Boiler number 22314 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1954 03/02/1955 51 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22870 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 15/09/1956 24/11/1956 71 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28813 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1957 04/05/1957 22 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 29/02/1960 06/04/1960 38 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 24/05/1960 03/06/1960 11 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 10/05/1962 27/07/1962 79 days General
Boiler number 28391 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1650
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3734
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
02/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 09/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6319
   
09/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
13/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
29/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1924. Dep: 04/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1145 (Diagram 15)
   
22/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1927. Dep: 05/09/1927.    
11/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1929. Dep: 08/08/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1329 (Diagram 15)
   
11/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1931. Dep: 14/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1238 (Diagram 15)
   
08/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1933. Dep: 07/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1098 (Diagram 15)
   
08/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1935. Dep: 30/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1275 (Diagram 15)
   
01/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1937. Dep: 23/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15)
   
06/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3667 (Diagram 15D)
   
23/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942.    
08/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3683 (Diagram 15D)
   
24/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
16/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
12/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3706    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
10/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1946. Dep: 28/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3670 (Diagram 15D)
   
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
20/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
07/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
22/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1948. Dep: 24/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3697 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63706
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
04/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1951. Dep: 21/07/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22320 (Diagram 15D)
   
18/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
04/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1953. Dep: 08/08/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22314 (Diagram 15D)
   
27/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
15/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 15/12/1954. Dep: 03/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22870 (Diagram 15D)
   
17/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
15/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1956. Dep: 24/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28813 (Diagram 100A)
   
13/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/04/1957. Dep: 04/05/1957.    
29/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/02/1960. Dep: 06/04/1960.    
24/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/05/1960. Dep: 03/06/1960.    
10/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1962. Dep: 27/07/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28391 (Diagram 100A)
   
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
26/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63706 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev