Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 589 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3234 Week
» 5816 Month
» 270449 Year
» 1492014 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1687 m/e 11/1918
LNER (1924) 6499   24/10/1925
War Dept. 712   13/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E106
Works Number 3735
To Service During 11/1918
Taken into Stock 24/10/1925
Withdrawal Sat 13/09/1941 off Woodford Halse (WFD)
Service Life 22 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 712 and sent to the Middle East via Birkenhead, 16/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1918
GOR Gorton 22/10/1925
WFD Woodford Halse 04/11/1925
   Withdrawn 13/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1052)
28/12/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1170)
30/01/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1330)
02/06/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1340)
24/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1220)
24/10/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
14/01/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1179)
15/02/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3356)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 18/07/1925 24/10/1925 99 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6499
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1927 17/12/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 07/12/1929 28/12/1929 22 days General
Boiler number 1170 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/01/1932 30/01/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1330 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/05/1934 02/06/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/10/1936 24/10/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1220 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1938 14/01/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 1179 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/02/1941 15/02/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 3356 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1687
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3735
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
18/07/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1925. Dep: 24/10/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6499
   
22/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/10/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
04/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
05/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1927. Dep: 17/12/1927.    
07/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1929. Dep: 28/12/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1170 (Diagram 15)
   
16/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1932. Dep: 30/01/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1330 (Diagram 15)
   
19/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1934. Dep: 02/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15)
   
10/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1936. Dep: 24/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1220 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
24/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1938. Dep: 14/01/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1179 (Diagram 15)
   
01/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1941. Dep: 15/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3356 (Diagram 15)
   
13/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 712 from Woodford Halse (WFD)    
13/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 712    

prev prev