Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 144 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4385 Week
» 17418 Month
» 239819 Year
» 1124200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1845 m/e 01/1918
LNER (1924) 6279   08/03/1924
War Dept. 703   13/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21822
To Service During 01/1918
Taken into Stock 08/03/1924
Withdrawal Sat 13/09/1941 off Colwick (CLK)
Service Life 23 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 703 and sent to the Middle East via Birkenhead, 11/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 14/03/1924
ARD Ardsley 02/02/1925
NWE New England 02/03/1925
CLK Colwick 16/03/1925
   Withdrawn 13/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1301)
23/08/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1493)
17/09/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 855)
26/01/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1879)
29/05/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1255)
27/05/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3289)
06/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 931)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 23/02/1924 08/03/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6279
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1924 23/08/1924 85 days General
Boiler number 1493 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/06/1927 16/07/1927 36 days General  
Gorton Works 16/11/1929 28/12/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 20/08/1932 17/09/1932 29 days General
Boiler number 855 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1935 26/01/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 1879 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1937 29/05/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 1255 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1939 27/05/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3289 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/08/1941 06/09/1941 22 days General
Boiler number 931 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1845
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21822
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
23/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 08/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6279
   
08/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
14/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
31/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1924. Dep: 23/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1493 (Diagram 15)
   
02/02/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
02/03/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
16/03/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
11/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1927. Dep: 16/07/1927.    
16/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1929. Dep: 28/12/1929.    
20/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1932. Dep: 17/09/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 855 (Diagram 15)
   
19/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1935. Dep: 26/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1879 (Diagram 15)
   
08/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1937. Dep: 29/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1255 (Diagram 15)
   
13/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1939. Dep: 27/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3289 (Diagram 15)
   
16/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1941. Dep: 06/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 931 (Diagram 15)
   
13/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 703 from Colwick (CLK)    
13/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 703    

prev prev