Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 68 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1015 Week
» 19797 Month
» 268090 Year
» 1152471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1847 m/e 12/1917
LNER (1924) 6276   26/01/1924
LNER (1946) 3758   25/05/1946
BR 63758 w/e 21/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/312/1917
O4/708/04/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21824
To Service During 12/1917
Taken into Stock 26/01/1924
Withdrawal Thu 24/05/1962 off Immingham (40B)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 44 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 06/02/1924
WFD Woodford Halse 06/09/1944
DON Doncaster 03/02/1946
40E Langwith Junction 25/06/1950
40D Tuxford 09/01/1955
41J Langwith Junction 01/02/1959
40B Immingham 01/05/1960
   Withdrawn 24/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 28/02/1946
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 14/05/1960
WDN   24/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1184)
06/09/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1489)
29/06/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1494)
07/03/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1225)
22/04/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1096)
15/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1291)
17/10/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
17/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3264)
25/02/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1042)
16/08/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1076)
08/04/1944 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 5102)
25/05/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3665)
21/08/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3690)
05/05/1951 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22318)
11/07/1953 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22309)
27/08/1955 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22311)
19/01/1957 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22316)
21/03/1959 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22332)
21/03/1959 Water Treatment apparatus fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 19/01/1924 26/01/1924 8 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6276
 
Gorton Works 21/06/1924 06/09/1924 78 days General
Boiler number 1489 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1927 14/05/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 20/04/1929 29/06/1929 71 days General
Boiler number 1494 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1931 07/03/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/04/1933 22/04/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1096 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1935 15/06/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1291 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/10/1936 17/10/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 3264 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1939 25/02/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 1042 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1941 16/08/1941 13 days General
Boiler number 1076 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/03/1944 08/04/1944 34 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 5102 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1946 25/05/1946 15 days General
Boiler number 3665 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3758
 
Gorton Works 31/07/1948 21/08/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3690 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63758
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1951 05/05/1951 36 days General
Boiler number 22318 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1953 11/07/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22309 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1953 20/07/1953 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 30/07/1955 27/08/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 22311 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1956 19/01/1957 50 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22316 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1959 21/03/1959 22 days General
Boiler number 22332 (Diagram 15D)
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 
Gorton Works 23/05/1962 23/05/1962 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1847
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21824
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
19/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/01/1924. Dep: 26/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6276
   
26/01/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
06/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
21/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1924. Dep: 06/09/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1489 (Diagram 15)
   
02/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1927. Dep: 14/05/1927.    
20/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1929. Dep: 29/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1494 (Diagram 15)
   
21/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1931. Dep: 07/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15)
   
08/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1933. Dep: 22/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1096 (Diagram 15)
   
01/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1935. Dep: 15/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1291 (Diagram 15)
   
10/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1936. Dep: 17/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3264 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
18/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1042 (Diagram 15)
   
04/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1941. Dep: 16/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1076 (Diagram 15)
   
06/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1944. Dep: 08/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 5102 (Diagram 15D)
   
06/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
03/02/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
11/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1946. Dep: 25/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3665 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3758
   
31/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1948. Dep: 21/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3690 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63758
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
31/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1951. Dep: 05/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22318 (Diagram 15D)
   
20/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1953. Dep: 11/07/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22309 (Diagram 15D)
   
14/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/07/1953. Dep: 20/07/1953.    
09/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
30/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1955. Dep: 27/08/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22311 (Diagram 15D)
   
01/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 01/12/1956. Dep: 19/01/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22316 (Diagram 15D)
   
01/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
28/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1959. Dep: 21/03/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22332 (Diagram 15D)
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
01/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
23/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/05/1962. Dep: 23/05/1962.    
24/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63758 from Immingham (40B)    

prev prev