Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 940 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 5071 Week
» 15241 Month
» 293037 Year
» 1177418 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1848 m/e 12/1917
GCR 1282c   19/01/1924
LNER (1924) 6282   07/02/1925
LNER (1946) 3759   26/05/1946
BR 63759 w/e 28/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21825
To Service During 12/1917
Taken into Stock 19/01/1924
Withdrawal Sun 23/09/1962 off Immingham (40B)
Scrapping Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
Service Life 44 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Round Oak Steel, Brierley Hill, 8/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 01/02/1924
ANN Annesley 31/03/1924
STV Staveley (G.C.) 24/03/1932
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
LNG Langwith Junction 23/02/1949
40B Immingham 24/07/1955
   Withdrawn 23/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 26/02/1949
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 13/08/1955
WDN   23/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1151)
07/02/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1336)
15/02/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1863)
06/02/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1461)
09/06/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1445)
30/05/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3241)
30/05/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
26/10/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1131)
13/02/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3310)
06/01/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3206)
26/07/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3279)
02/04/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1235)
17/11/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22227)
19/12/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22206)
08/09/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22895)
26/09/1959 Water Treatment apparatus fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 29/12/1923 19/01/1924 22 days Light Repair
Renumbered to GCR 1282c
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1924 07/02/1925 78 days General
Boiler number 1336 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6282
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1927 12/11/1927 36 days General  
Gorton Works 25/01/1930 15/02/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1863 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1932 06/02/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1461 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/05/1934 09/06/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1445 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/05/1936 30/05/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 02/07/1938 16/07/1938 15 days General  
Gorton Works 19/10/1940 26/10/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 08/01/1943 13/02/1943 37 days General
Boiler number 3310 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1944 06/01/1945 15 days General
Boiler number 3206 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/06/1947 26/07/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1948 28/08/1948 40 days Heavy
Renumbered to BR 63759
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1949 02/04/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/11/1951 17/11/1951 15 days General
Boiler number 22227 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1951 30/11/1951 11 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 05/12/1953 19/12/1953 15 days General
Boiler number 22206 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1953 20/12/1953 1 day Unclassified  
Gorton Works 03/07/1955 08/07/1955 6 days Light Casual
Tender changed
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1956 08/09/1956 36 days General
Boiler number 22895 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1959 26/09/1959 36 days Heavy Intermediate
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1848
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21825
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
29/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/12/1923. Dep: 19/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to GCR 1282c
   
19/01/1924 To Stock To GCR stock    
01/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
31/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
22/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1924. Dep: 07/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1336 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6282
   
08/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1927. Dep: 12/11/1927.    
25/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1930. Dep: 15/02/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1863 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1932. Dep: 06/02/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1461 (Diagram 15)
   
24/03/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
26/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1934. Dep: 09/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1445 (Diagram 15)
   
23/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1936. Dep: 30/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
02/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1938. Dep: 16/07/1938.    
19/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1940. Dep: 26/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15)
   
08/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1943. Dep: 13/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3310 (Diagram 15)
   
23/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1944. Dep: 06/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3206 (Diagram 15)
   
26/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3759    
21/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1947. Dep: 26/07/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15)
   
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
20/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/07/1948. Dep: 28/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63759
   
23/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
12/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1949. Dep: 02/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15)
   
03/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1951. Dep: 17/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22227 (Diagram 15)
   
20/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/11/1951. Dep: 30/11/1951.    
05/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22206 (Diagram 15)
   
20/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1953. Dep: 20/12/1953.    
03/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/07/1955. Dep: 08/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender changed
   
24/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
04/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1956. Dep: 08/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22895 (Diagram 15)
   
22/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/08/1959. Dep: 26/09/1959.
Work undertaken:
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
23/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63759 from Immingham (40B)    

prev prev