Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 346 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1271 Week
» 18607 Month
» 296403 Year
» 1180784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1849 m/e 02/1918
LNWR 2933 m/e 12/1919
LNER (1924) 6579   12/05/1928
LNER (1946) 3760   30/08/1946
BR 63760 w/e 04/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/302/1918
O131/08/1946
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21826
To Service During 02/1918
Taken into Stock 12/05/1928
Withdrawal Mon 26/11/1962 off Tyne Dock (52H)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 44 yrs, 9 mths , 26 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 5/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
YK York (North) 12/05/1928
HLS Hull Springhead 21/08/1930
CUD Cudworth 12/01/1934
HTN Heaton 28/03/1943
TDK Tyne Dock 23/07/1945
DAR Darlington 06/02/1949
HLD Hull Dairycoates 11/09/1949
53C Hull Springhead 05/02/1950
53A Hull Dairycoates 21/05/1950
54B Tyne Dock 02/09/1951
   Withdrawn 26/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DAR Darlington w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 21/05/1950
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 02/09/1951
WDN   26/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1318)
05/03/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1876)
01/04/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1948)
22/12/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1142)
22/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 486)
03/12/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1863)
15/03/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1150)
04/12/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3337)
31/08/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5082)
04/06/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5022)
01/09/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28339)
07/06/1952 Vacuum Ejector fitted
26/07/1952 Westinghouse Brake fitted
03/10/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28273)
08/03/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28310)
04/10/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28974)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 03/03/1928 12/05/1928 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6579
 
Darlington Works 23/01/1931 05/03/1931 42 days General
Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1933 01/04/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 1948 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1934 22/12/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1142 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/08/1936 22/08/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 486 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/11/1938 03/12/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 1863 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1941 15/03/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 1150 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/11/1943 04/12/1943 19 days General
Boiler number 3337 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1945 17/02/1945 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 25/05/1946 31/08/1946 99 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5082 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3760
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1949 04/06/1949 32 days General
Boiler number 5022 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63760
 
Gorton Works 26/07/1951 01/09/1951 38 days General
Boiler number 28339 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/05/1952 07/06/1952 30 days Light Casual
Vacuum Ejector fitted
 
Gorton Works 15/07/1952 26/07/1952 12 days Light Casual
Westinghouse pumps fitted for working iron ore traffic
Westinghouse Brake fitted
 
Gorton Works 01/09/1953 03/10/1953 33 days General
Boiler number 28273 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 29/12/1955 08/03/1956 71 days General
Boiler number 28310 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 19/06/1956 18/08/1956 61 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 20/08/1958 04/10/1958 46 days General
Boiler number 28974 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1960 13/08/1960 46 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 08/08/1961 30/09/1961 54 days Light Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1849
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21826
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2933    
08/1921 Allocation      
03/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1928. Dep: 12/05/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6579
   
12/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
12/05/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
21/08/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
23/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1931. Dep: 05/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15)
   
11/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 01/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1948 (Diagram 15)
   
12/01/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD)    
15/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1934. Dep: 22/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1142 (Diagram 15)
   
15/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1936. Dep: 22/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 486 (Diagram 15)
   
19/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1938. Dep: 03/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1863 (Diagram 15)
   
01/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1941. Dep: 15/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1150 (Diagram 15)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
16/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1943. Dep: 04/12/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3337 (Diagram 15)
   
10/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1945. Dep: 17/02/1945.    
23/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
25/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5082 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3760
   
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
04/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1949. Dep: 04/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5022 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63760
   
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
05/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
26/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1951. Dep: 01/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28339 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
09/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/05/1952. Dep: 07/06/1952.
Work undertaken:
Vacuum Ejector fitted
   
15/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/07/1952. Dep: 26/07/1952.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse pumps fitted for working iron ore traffic
Westinghouse Brake fitted
   
01/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1953. Dep: 03/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28273 (Diagram 100A)
   
29/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1955. Dep: 08/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28310 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/06/1956. Dep: 18/08/1956.    
20/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1958. Dep: 04/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28974 (Diagram 100A)
   
29/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/06/1960. Dep: 13/08/1960.    
08/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 08/08/1961. Dep: 30/09/1961.    
26/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63760 from Tyne Dock (52H)    

prev prev