|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 03/03/1928 | 12/05/1928 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6579 |
||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1931 | 05/03/1931 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1933 | 01/04/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1948 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1934 | 22/12/1934 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1142 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1936 | 22/08/1936 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 486 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/11/1938 | 03/12/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1863 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1941 | 15/03/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1150 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1943 | 04/12/1943 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 3337 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1945 | 17/02/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1946 | 31/08/1946 | 99 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5082 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3760 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1949 | 04/06/1949 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 5022 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63760 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/07/1951 | 01/09/1951 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28339 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/05/1952 | 07/06/1952 | 30 days | Light Casual | Vacuum Ejector fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 15/07/1952 | 26/07/1952 | 12 days | Light Casual | Westinghouse pumps fitted for working iron ore traffic Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1953 | 03/10/1953 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28273 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/12/1955 | 08/03/1956 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 28310 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/06/1956 | 18/08/1956 | 61 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1958 | 04/10/1958 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28974 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/06/1960 | 13/08/1960 | 46 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1961 | 30/09/1961 | 54 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1956 | York MPD | December, 1955-January, 1956. On 28/12/55 60152 (64B), ex-works, was in York shed yard, and 60161 (64B) in similar circumstances on 5/1/56. 67764 (53B) was also at York on 28/12/55 en route for Darlington Works, whilst 67724 (30A) which had called at York, in rather poor condition, on 9/11/55, returned southward bound from Darlington Works on 12/1/56 in a more attractive state. On 29/12/55 new B.R. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73106 from Doncaster was at York, with 76024 (52C) passing through for Doncaster Works. On the following day a very smart 60919 (61B) worked an up goods into Dringhouses during the course of running-in. from Darlington. On 4/1/56 44592 (5B) was an unusual visitor to York, whilst 63760 (54B) put in an appearance while on route for overhaul at Gorton. On the same day three very rusty and forlorn 'Sl' 0-8-4Ts were at York en route for scrapping at Darlington, namely 69900 (36A), 69902 (36B), 69904 (36B). 69900/04 were hauled in by 61188 (38A) in particularly smart trim. 69902 was still at York on the following day which was also marked by the unusual simultaneous appearance in York station of two 'B17s', 61626 (31A) and 61656 (32A); the former brought in the 7.20 a.m. Colchester to Newcastle train which has also recently produced Woodford V2s 60890 an 60915 instead of the more-usual Doncaster or March engine. On 12/1/56 unusual visitors were 43088 (35A), and from the L.M.R. 44692 (24A) and 45211 (25G). The beginning of the year saw the number of 'J25s' in store at York south shed reduced to two, i.e., 65675 an 65677, but the ex-L.M.S.. shed still contains 69864 (50G), 62702 (50A), 62746 (50D) and 62761 (50D) in store. 62730 (50A) is still dumped out of service in the north shed yard but 62345 is at last showing signs of awakening from her-very prolonged hibernation. |
SLS/195605 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1849 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21826 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2933 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
03/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1928. Dep: 12/05/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6579 |
||
12/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
12/05/1928 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
21/08/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
23/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1931. Dep: 05/03/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 01/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1948 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/01/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
15/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1934. Dep: 22/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1142 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
15/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1936. Dep: 22/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 486 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1938. Dep: 03/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1863 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1941. Dep: 15/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1150 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
16/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1943. Dep: 04/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3337 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1945. Dep: 17/02/1945. | ||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
25/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5082 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3760 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
04/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1949. Dep: 04/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5022 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63760 |
||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
05/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
11/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
26/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1951. Dep: 01/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28339 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) | ||
09/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/05/1952. Dep: 07/06/1952. Work undertaken: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
||
15/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/07/1952. Dep: 26/07/1952. Work undertaken: Westinghouse pumps fitted for working iron ore traffic Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
01/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1953. Dep: 03/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28273 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1955. Dep: 08/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28310 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/06/1956. Dep: 18/08/1956. | ||
20/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1958. Dep: 04/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28974 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/06/1960. Dep: 13/08/1960. | ||
08/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 08/08/1961. Dep: 30/09/1961. | ||
26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63760 from Tyne Dock (52H) |