Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 7 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 3395 Week
» 16428 Month
» 238829 Year
» 1123210 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1855 m/e 03/1918
LNER (1924) 6273   05/04/1924
War Dept. 776   11/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21832
To Service During 03/1918
Taken into Stock 05/04/1924
Withdrawal Sat 11/10/1941 off Annesley (ANN)
Service Life 23 yrs, 7 mths , 12 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 776 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 05/04/1924
ARD Ardsley 09/10/1924
MEX Mexborough 09/08/1926
GOR Gorton 20/05/1929
ANN Annesley 06/10/1937
   Withdrawn 11/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1363)
09/08/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1353)
18/05/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1941)
09/05/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1881)
04/03/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 927)
27/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 861)
28/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3202)
11/11/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3205)
11/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3376)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 15/03/1924 05/04/1924 22 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6273
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1924 09/08/1924 71 days General
Boiler number 1353 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/08/1927 01/10/1927 50 days General  
Gorton Works 23/02/1929 18/05/1929 85 days General
Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1931 09/05/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/02/1933 04/03/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1935 27/07/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 861 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1937 28/08/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 3202 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1939 11/11/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3205 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1941 11/10/1941 19 days General
Boiler number 3376 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 776
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1855
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21832
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
15/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/03/1924. Dep: 05/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6273
   
05/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/04/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
31/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1924. Dep: 09/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1353 (Diagram 15)
   
09/10/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
09/08/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
13/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1927. Dep: 01/10/1927.    
23/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1929. Dep: 18/05/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15)
   
20/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
25/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1931. Dep: 09/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15)
   
25/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1933. Dep: 04/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15)
   
13/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1935. Dep: 27/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 861 (Diagram 15)
   
14/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1937. Dep: 28/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3202 (Diagram 15)
   
06/10/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
28/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 11/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3205 (Diagram 15)
   
23/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1941. Dep: 11/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3376 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 776
   
11/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 776 from Annesley (ANN)    

prev prev