Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 133 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4264 Week
» 14434 Month
» 292230 Year
» 1176611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1857 m/e 03/1918
LNWR 2932 m/e 12/1919
LNWR 2952 m/e 06/1920
LNER (1924) 6581   26/05/1928
LNER (1946) 3764   16/06/1946
BR 63764 w/e 12/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21834
To Service During 03/1918
Taken into Stock 26/05/1928
Withdrawal Sun 27/02/1966 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 47 yrs, 11 mths , 29 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 4/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
91LNWR (on loan)   06/1920
ROD     08/1921
HLD Hull Dairycoates 26/05/1928
HLS Hull Springhead 27/09/1929
WHL West Hartlepool 09/05/1940
HLS Hull Springhead 13/01/1945
HLD Hull Dairycoates 29/04/1946
36A Doncaster 02/09/1951
36B Mexborough 15/05/1955
36C Frodingham 27/12/1959
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 20/11/1960
36A Doncaster 03/03/1963
   Withdrawn 27/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 36A Doncaster 02/09/1951
ALLOC 36A Doncaster w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 26/11/1960
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 5w/e 06/04/1963
WDN   w/e 27/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1321)
03/10/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1307)
14/09/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1020)
01/05/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1314)
02/07/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 42)
06/01/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 949)
18/04/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 855)
24/06/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1285)
09/03/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3351)
12/06/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3329)
09/08/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3263)
15/11/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22185)
08/03/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22172)
17/03/1962 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22233)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 12/05/1928 26/05/1928 15 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6581
 
Darlington Works 08/04/1930 05/07/1930 89 days General  
Gorton Works 05/08/1933 03/10/1933 60 days General
Boiler number 1307 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1935 14/09/1935 29 days General
Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/04/1937 01/05/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 1314 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1938 02/07/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 42 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1939 06/01/1940 36 days General
Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/03/1942 18/04/1942 22 days General
Boiler number 855 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1944 24/06/1944 29 days General
Boiler number 1285 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/02/1946 09/03/1946 31 days General
Boiler number 3351 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1948 12/06/1948 41 days General
Boiler number 3329 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63764
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1949 08/10/1949 25 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 16/06/1950 09/08/1950 55 days General
Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1952 15/11/1952 31 days General
Boiler number 22185 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1955 19/02/1955 41 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 21/12/1955 04/02/1956 46 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 07/02/1958 08/03/1958 30 days General
Boiler number 22172 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1962 17/03/1962 38 days General
Boiler number 22233 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1857
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21834
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2932    
06/1920 Allocation      
06/1920 Renumbered Renumbered to 2952    
08/1921 Allocation      
12/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1928. Dep: 26/05/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6581
   
26/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
26/05/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
27/09/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
08/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1930. Dep: 05/07/1930.    
05/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1933. Dep: 03/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1307 (Diagram 15)
   
17/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1935. Dep: 14/09/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15)
   
03/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1937. Dep: 01/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1314 (Diagram 15)
   
04/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 42 (Diagram 15)
   
02/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1939. Dep: 06/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15)
   
09/05/1940 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
28/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1942. Dep: 18/04/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 855 (Diagram 15)
   
27/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1285 (Diagram 15)
   
13/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
07/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1946. Dep: 09/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3351 (Diagram 15)
   
29/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
16/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3764    
03/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1948. Dep: 12/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3329 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63764
   
14/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 14/09/1949. Dep: 08/10/1949.    
16/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1950. Dep: 09/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 15)
   
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
16/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1952. Dep: 15/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22185 (Diagram 15)
   
10/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/01/1955. Dep: 19/02/1955.    
15/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
21/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/12/1955. Dep: 04/02/1956.    
07/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1958. Dep: 08/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22172 (Diagram 15)
   
27/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
20/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
08/02/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1962. Dep: 17/03/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22233 (Diagram 15)
   
18/03/1962 Sightings Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Gorton shed.   Link
03/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
27/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 63764 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev