Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 658 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4789 Week
» 14959 Month
» 292755 Year
» 1177136 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1858 m/e 03/1918
LNER (1924) 6271   23/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3765   03/08/1946
BR 63765 w/e 27/03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/303/1918
O4/814/12/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21835
To Service During 03/1918
Taken into Stock 23/02/1924
Withdrawal Sun 11/10/1964 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 46 yrs, 7 mths , 12 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington 1/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster 25/03/1924
MEX Mexborough 01/12/1936
LNG Langwith Junction 04/06/1937
DON Doncaster 27/10/1946
40E Langwith Junction 25/06/1950
   Withdrawn 11/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction m/e 30/06/1950
WDN   11/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1453)
02/03/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1956)
13/11/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1323)
31/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1174)
24/11/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1326)
22/10/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
22/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3263)
03/12/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3356)
25/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3347)
23/04/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3377)
26/01/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1254)
28/03/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3334)
12/08/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 872)
13/12/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22881)
12/02/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22280)
14/12/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28940)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 05/01/1924 23/02/1924 50 days Heavy
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6271
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1926 08/07/1926 78 days General  
Gorton Works 13/10/1929 02/03/1929 -224 days General  
Gorton Works 24/09/1930 13/11/1930 51 days General
Boiler number 1323 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1932 31/12/1932 34 days General
Boiler number 1174 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/11/1934 24/11/1934 18 days General
Boiler number 1326 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1936 22/10/1936 36 days General
Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1938 03/12/1938 38 days General
Boiler number 3356 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/01/1941 25/01/1941 22 days General
Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 17/02/1943 23/04/1943 66 days General
Boiler number 3377 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1945 26/01/1946 78 days General
Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1947 29/05/1947 120 days General  
Gorton Works 23/02/1948 28/03/1948 35 days General
Boiler number 3334 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63765
 
Gorton Works 18/07/1950 12/08/1950 26 days General
Boiler number 872 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/11/1952 13/12/1952 27 days General
Boiler number 22881 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/01/1955 12/02/1955 38 days General
Boiler number 22280 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1957 14/12/1957 65 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28940 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 14/03/1958 12/04/1958 30 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 28/07/1958 09/08/1958 13 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 23/09/1958 27/09/1958 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 17/01/1961 23/02/1961 38 days Light Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1858
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21835
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
05/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 05/01/1924. Dep: 23/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6271
   
23/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
25/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
22/04/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1926. Dep: 08/07/1926.    
02/03/1929 Modification Diagram 15 number 1956 boiler fitted    
13/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1929. Dep: 02/03/1929.    
24/09/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1930. Dep: 13/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1323 (Diagram 15)
   
28/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1932. Dep: 31/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1174 (Diagram 15)
   
07/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1934. Dep: 24/11/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1326 (Diagram 15)
   
17/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1936. Dep: 22/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
01/12/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
04/06/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
27/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1938. Dep: 03/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3356 (Diagram 15)
   
04/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1941. Dep: 25/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 15)
   
17/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1943. Dep: 23/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3377 (Diagram 15)
   
10/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1945. Dep: 26/01/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15)
   
03/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3765    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
30/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1947. Dep: 29/05/1947.    
23/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1948. Dep: 28/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3334 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63765
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
18/07/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1950. Dep: 12/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 872 (Diagram 15)
   
17/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1952. Dep: 13/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22881 (Diagram 15)
   
06/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1955. Dep: 12/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22280 (Diagram 15)
   
11/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1957. Dep: 14/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28940 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1958. Dep: 12/04/1958.    
28/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/07/1958. Dep: 09/08/1958.    
23/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/09/1958. Dep: 27/09/1958.    
17/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 17/01/1961. Dep: 23/02/1961.    
11/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63765 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev