|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 28/07/1928 | 08/12/1928 | 134 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/2 Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6582 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/01/1929 | 12/01/1929 | 2 days | Unclassified | Fitted with side doors |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/08/1931 | 29/08/1931 | 27 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/07/1933 | 22/07/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1038 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/11/1935 | 16/11/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1939 | 04/02/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/07/1941 | 19/07/1941 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1943 | 24/12/1943 | 10 days | General | Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/02/1946 | 09/03/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/04/1948 | 22/05/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3331 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63766 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1951 | 27/01/1951 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22156 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1951 | 06/02/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1953 | 05/09/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22189 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/04/1956 | 19/05/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22165 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1959 | 07/02/1959 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22138 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/04/1961 | 01/04/1961 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1962 | 25/08/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1859 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21836 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
01/1921 | Allocation | |||
01/1921 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2979 | ||
28/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1928. Dep: 08/12/1928. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/2 Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6582 |
||
11/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/01/1929. Dep: 12/01/1929. Work undertaken: Fitted with side doors |
||
15/01/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
15/01/1929 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
07/10/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
03/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1931. Dep: 29/08/1931. | ||
08/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1933. Dep: 22/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1038 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1935. Dep: 16/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1939. Dep: 04/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1941. Dep: 19/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU) | ||
30/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
15/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1943. Dep: 24/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
16/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1946. Dep: 09/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3766 | ||
24/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1948. Dep: 22/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3331 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63766 |
||
13/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1951. Dep: 27/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22156 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1951. Dep: 06/02/1951. | ||
21/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
15/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1953. Dep: 05/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22189 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/11/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
21/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1956. Dep: 19/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22165 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1959. Dep: 07/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22138 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Weighing) - Arr: 01/04/1961. Dep: 01/04/1961. | ||
25/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 25/08/1962. Dep: 25/08/1962. | ||
26/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63766 from Gorton (9G) |