Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 578 Today
» 1207 Yesterday
» 578 Week
» 20223 Month
» 54865 Year
» 1276430 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1859 m/e 03/1918
LNWR 2979 m/e 01/1921
LNER (1924) 6582   08/12/1928
LNER (1946) 3766   26/05/1946
BR 63766 w/e 22/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/203/1918
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21836
To Service During 03/1918
Taken into Stock 15/01/1929
Withdrawal Sun 26/08/1962 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 44 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   01/1921
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 15/01/1929
DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 07/10/1930
DFU Dunfermline Upper 29/07/1943
DON Doncaster 30/09/1943
SHF Sheffield Darnall 25/06/1945
38A Colwick 21/06/1953
39A Gorton 21/11/1954
   Withdrawn 26/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 04/12/1954
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 01/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1443)
22/07/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1038)
16/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1187)
04/02/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 655)
19/07/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3279)
24/12/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1176)
09/03/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 815)
22/05/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3331)
27/01/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22156)
05/09/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22189)
19/05/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22165)
07/02/1959 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22138)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 28/07/1928 08/12/1928 134 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6582
 
Cowlairs Works 11/01/1929 12/01/1929 2 days Unclassified
Fitted with side doors
 
Cowlairs Works 03/08/1931 29/08/1931 27 days General  
Gorton Works 08/07/1933 22/07/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1038 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/11/1935 16/11/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1939 04/02/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1941 19/07/1941 12 days General
Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1943 24/12/1943 10 days General
Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/02/1946 09/03/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/04/1948 22/05/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 3331 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63766
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1951 27/01/1951 15 days General
Boiler number 22156 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1951 06/02/1951 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 15/08/1953 05/09/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22189 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/04/1956 19/05/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 22165 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1959 07/02/1959 29 days General
Boiler number 22138 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/04/1961 01/04/1961 1 day Weighing  
Gorton Works 25/08/1962 25/08/1962 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1859
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21836
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
01/1921 Allocation      
01/1921 Renumbered Renumbered to 2979    
28/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1928. Dep: 08/12/1928.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6582
   
11/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/01/1929. Dep: 12/01/1929.
Work undertaken:
Fitted with side doors
   
15/01/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
15/01/1929 To Stock To LNER stock    
07/10/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)    
03/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1931. Dep: 29/08/1931.    
08/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1933. Dep: 22/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1038 (Diagram 15)
   
02/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1935. Dep: 16/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15)
   
14/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1939. Dep: 04/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15)
   
08/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1941. Dep: 19/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15)
   
29/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
30/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
15/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1943. Dep: 24/12/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15)
   
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
16/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1946. Dep: 09/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15)
   
26/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3766    
24/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1948. Dep: 22/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3331 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63766
   
13/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1951. Dep: 27/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22156 (Diagram 15)
   
05/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1951. Dep: 06/02/1951.    
21/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
15/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1953. Dep: 05/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22189 (Diagram 15)
   
21/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
21/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1956. Dep: 19/05/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22165 (Diagram 15)
   
10/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1959. Dep: 07/02/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22138 (Diagram 15)
   
01/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Weighing) - Arr: 01/04/1961. Dep: 01/04/1961.    
25/08/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 25/08/1962. Dep: 25/08/1962.    
26/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63766 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev