Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 131 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4262 Week
» 14432 Month
» 292228 Year
» 1176609 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1860 m/e 03/1918
LNER (1924) 6274   26/01/1924
LNER (1946) 3767   18/08/1946
BR 63767 w/e 28/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21837
To Service During 03/1918
Taken into Stock 26/01/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/11/1962 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 44 yrs, 8 mths , 5 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 11/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 01/02/1924
ARD Ardsley 09/10/1924
MEX Mexborough 13/08/1926
ANN Annesley 18/02/1929
38D Staveley (G.C.) 08/10/1950
39A Gorton 18/11/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 03/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 24/11/1951
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 03/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1181)
30/08/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1303)
23/08/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 946)
24/06/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1079)
13/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1045)
12/06/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3293)
24/06/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1076)
19/07/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3281)
31/07/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3335)
05/05/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3235)
26/04/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1067)
28/05/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1297)
04/08/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22203)
26/12/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22199)
28/07/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22149)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 19/01/1924 26/01/1924 8 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6274
 
Gorton Works 14/06/1924 30/08/1924 78 days General
Boiler number 1303 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1927 10/12/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 26/07/1930 23/08/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 946 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/06/1933 24/06/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 1079 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1935 13/07/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1045 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/05/1937 12/06/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1939 24/06/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 1076 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1941 19/07/1941 12 days General
Boiler number 3281 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1943 31/07/1943 24 days General
Boiler number 3335 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1945 05/05/1945 22 days Heavy
After collision
Boiler number 3235 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1947 26/04/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 1067 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1949 28/05/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63767
 
Gorton Works 21/07/1951 04/08/1951 15 days General
Boiler number 22203 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/08/1951 09/08/1951 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 17/10/1951 27/10/1951 11 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 15/11/1951 20/11/1951 6 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 15/12/1951 29/12/1951 15 days Heavy Casual
Welded stays replaced by riveted type
 
Gorton Works 07/02/1953 14/02/1953 8 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Gorton Works 05/12/1953 26/12/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22199 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/11/1954 20/11/1954 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 16/06/1956 28/07/1956 43 days General
Boiler number 22149 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1960 07/05/1960 43 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 21/05/1960 28/05/1960 8 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1860
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21837
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
19/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/01/1924. Dep: 26/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6274
   
26/01/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
01/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1924. Dep: 30/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1303 (Diagram 15)
   
09/10/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
13/08/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
29/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1927. Dep: 10/12/1927.    
18/02/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
26/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1930. Dep: 23/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 946 (Diagram 15)
   
03/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1933. Dep: 24/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1079 (Diagram 15)
   
29/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1935. Dep: 13/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1045 (Diagram 15)
   
29/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1937. Dep: 12/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 15)
   
17/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1939. Dep: 24/06/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1076 (Diagram 15)
   
08/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1941. Dep: 19/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3281 (Diagram 15)
   
08/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1943. Dep: 31/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3335 (Diagram 15)
   
14/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/04/1945. Dep: 05/05/1945.
Work undertaken:
After collision
Boiler number 3235 (Diagram 15)
   
18/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3767    
22/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1947. Dep: 26/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1067 (Diagram 15)
   
14/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1949. Dep: 28/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63767
   
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
21/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1951. Dep: 04/08/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22203 (Diagram 15)
   
07/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/08/1951. Dep: 09/08/1951.    
17/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/10/1951. Dep: 27/10/1951.    
15/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/11/1951. Dep: 20/11/1951.    
18/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
15/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 15/12/1951. Dep: 29/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Welded stays replaced by riveted type
   
07/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/02/1953. Dep: 14/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
05/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1953. Dep: 26/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22199 (Diagram 15)
   
16/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/11/1954. Dep: 20/11/1954.    
16/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1956. Dep: 28/07/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22149 (Diagram 15)
   
26/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/03/1960. Dep: 07/05/1960.    
21/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/05/1960. Dep: 28/05/1960.    
03/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63767 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev