Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 56 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 3877 Week
» 21213 Month
» 299009 Year
» 1183390 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1861 m/e 03/1918
LNER (1924) 6513   07/11/1925
LNER (1946) 3768   30/06/1946
BR 63768 w/e 29/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/303/1918
O101/12/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21838
To Service During 03/1918
Taken into Stock 07/11/1925
Withdrawal Sun 11/07/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Mon 01/11/1965 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 47 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A Draper, Hull. 8/65 Cut up 1/11/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 05/11/1925
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 21/11/1925
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 16/07/1928
GOR Gorton 16/12/1945
CLK Colwick 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton 20/10/1946
38B Annesley 26/11/1950
38A Colwick 03/11/1957
41H Staveley (G.C.) 09/06/1963
41J Langwith Junction 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn 11/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1056)
27/09/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1355)
01/10/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1107)
13/10/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1124)
31/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1096)
17/12/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3263)
17/12/1938 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
22/03/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1876)
17/04/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3391)
01/12/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5047)
02/1946 Drop Grate fitted
29/05/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5056)
09/09/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28253)
13/12/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28329)
30/10/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28855)
19/01/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28448)
09/05/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28899)
20/11/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28289)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 08/08/1925 07/11/1925 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6513
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1928 19/05/1928 36 days General  
Gorton Works 23/08/1930 27/09/1930 36 days General
Boiler number 1355 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1932 01/10/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1107 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1934 13/10/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1124 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/10/1936 31/10/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1096 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/12/1938 17/12/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1941 22/03/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1943 17/04/1943 18 days General
Boiler number 3391 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1945 01/12/1945 85 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5047 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 1946 02/1946   Light Repair
Drop Grate fitted
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1946 13/04/1946 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 21/12/1946 21/12/1946 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 01/05/1948 29/05/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 5056 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63768
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1950 09/09/1950 22 days General
Boiler number 28253 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1951 09/06/1951 8 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 29/11/1952 13/12/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 28329 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 05/12/1953 26/12/1953 22 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 28/09/1954 30/10/1954 33 days General
Boiler number 28855 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1955 01/10/1955 29 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 22/12/1956 19/01/1957 29 days General
Boiler number 28448 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 11/04/1959 09/05/1959 29 days General
Boiler number 28899 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1959 30/09/1959 13 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 09/01/1960 16/01/1960 8 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 27/09/1962 20/11/1962 55 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28289 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 16/11/1964 15/01/1965 61 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1861
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21838
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
08/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1925. Dep: 07/11/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6513
   
05/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
07/11/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
21/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
14/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1928. Dep: 19/05/1928.    
16/07/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
23/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1930. Dep: 27/09/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1355 (Diagram 15)
   
24/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1932. Dep: 01/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1107 (Diagram 15)
   
06/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1934. Dep: 13/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1124 (Diagram 15)
   
17/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1936. Dep: 31/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1096 (Diagram 15)
   
03/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1938. Dep: 17/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
08/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1941. Dep: 22/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15)
   
31/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1943. Dep: 17/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3391 (Diagram 15)
   
08/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5047 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: ?/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Drop Grate fitted
   
13/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/04/1946. Dep: 13/04/1946.    
30/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3768    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
21/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/12/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946.    
01/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1948. Dep: 29/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5056 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63768
   
19/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1950. Dep: 09/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28253 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
02/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/06/1951. Dep: 09/06/1951.    
29/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1952. Dep: 13/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28329 (Diagram 100A)
   
05/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/12/1953. Dep: 26/12/1953.    
28/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1954. Dep: 30/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28855 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/09/1955. Dep: 01/10/1955.    
22/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1956. Dep: 19/01/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28448 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
11/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1959. Dep: 09/05/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28899 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/09/1959. Dep: 30/09/1959.    
09/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/01/1960. Dep: 16/01/1960.    
27/09/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 27/09/1962. Dep: 20/11/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28289 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
16/11/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/11/1964. Dep: 15/01/1965.    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
11/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63768 from Langwith Junction (41J)    
01/11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev