|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 08/08/1925 | 07/11/1925 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6513 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1928 | 19/05/1928 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/08/1930 | 27/09/1930 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1355 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/09/1932 | 01/10/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1107 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/10/1934 | 13/10/1934 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1124 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/10/1936 | 31/10/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1096 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/12/1938 | 17/12/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1941 | 22/03/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1943 | 17/04/1943 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 3391 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1945 | 01/12/1945 | 85 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5047 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 1946 | 02/1946 | Light Repair | Drop Grate fitted |
|||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1946 | 13/04/1946 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 21/12/1946 | 21/12/1946 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 01/05/1948 | 29/05/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 5056 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63768 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1950 | 09/09/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28253 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1951 | 09/06/1951 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 29/11/1952 | 13/12/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 28329 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/12/1953 | 26/12/1953 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 28/09/1954 | 30/10/1954 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28855 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1955 | 01/10/1955 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1956 | 19/01/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28448 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/04/1959 | 09/05/1959 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28899 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/09/1959 | 30/09/1959 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1960 | 16/01/1960 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1962 | 20/11/1962 | 55 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28289 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1964 | 15/01/1965 | 61 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1861 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21838 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
08/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1925. Dep: 07/11/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6513 |
||
05/11/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
07/11/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
21/11/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
14/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1928. Dep: 19/05/1928. | ||
16/07/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
23/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1930. Dep: 27/09/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1355 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1932. Dep: 01/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1107 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1934. Dep: 13/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1124 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1936. Dep: 31/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1096 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1938. Dep: 17/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
08/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1941. Dep: 22/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1943. Dep: 17/04/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3391 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5047 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: ?/02/1946. Work undertaken: Drop Grate fitted |
||
13/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/04/1946. Dep: 13/04/1946. | ||
30/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3768 | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
21/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/12/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946. | ||
01/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1948. Dep: 29/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5056 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63768 |
||
19/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1950. Dep: 09/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28253 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
02/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/06/1951. Dep: 09/06/1951. | ||
29/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1952. Dep: 13/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28329 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/12/1953. Dep: 26/12/1953. | ||
28/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1954. Dep: 30/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28855 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/09/1955. Dep: 01/10/1955. | ||
22/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1956. Dep: 19/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28448 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
11/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1959. Dep: 09/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28899 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/09/1959. Dep: 30/09/1959. | ||
09/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/01/1960. Dep: 16/01/1960. | ||
27/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 27/09/1962. Dep: 20/11/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28289 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
16/11/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/11/1964. Dep: 15/01/1965. | ||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
11/07/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63768 from Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
01/11/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |