Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 144 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4385 Week
» 17418 Month
» 239819 Year
» 1124200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1863 m/e 04/1918
LNER (1924) 6584   24/03/1928
LNER (1946) 3770   16/06/1946
BR 63770 w/e 22/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/304/1918
O4/715/06/1940
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21840
To Service During 04/1918
Taken into Stock 24/03/1928
Withdrawal Sun 19/12/1965 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 47 yrs, 8 mths , 18 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to J Cashmore, Great Bridge, 2/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLD Hull Dairycoates 24/03/1928
HLS Hull Springhead 18/11/1929
WHL West Hartlepool 10/05/1941
HLD Hull Dairycoates 05/03/1945
53C Hull Springhead 15/04/1951
81C Southall (on loan) 02/09/1951
40B Immingham 16/09/1951
40E Colwick 07/12/1958
   Withdrawn 19/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead w/e 21/04/1951
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 02/09/1951
ALLOC 40B Immingham w/e 22/09/1951
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 27/12/1958
WDN   w/e 19/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1307)
31/12/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 868)
21/10/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 487)
30/12/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1458)
07/05/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3248)
15/06/1940 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3672)
03/03/1945 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3667)
09/08/1947 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3679)
22/10/1949 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3674)
14/06/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22335)
25/03/1955 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22314)
16/11/1957 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22309)
18/03/1961 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22302)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 17/03/1928 24/03/1928 8 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6584
 
Darlington Works 15/11/1930 31/12/1930 47 days General
Boiler number 868 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1933 21/10/1933 57 days General
Boiler number 487 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1935 30/12/1935 31 days General
Boiler number 1458 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1938 07/05/1938 36 days General
Boiler number 3248 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1940 15/06/1940 31 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3672 (Diagram 15D)
 
Darlington Works 01/01/1942 01/01/1942 1 day Weighing  
Gorton Works 07/11/1942 12/12/1942 36 days General  
Gorton Works 18/09/1943 09/10/1943 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 09/01/1945 03/03/1945 54 days General
Boiler number 3667 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 21/06/1947 09/08/1947 50 days General
Boiler number 3679 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1949 22/10/1949 39 days General
Boiler number 3674 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63770
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 29 days General
Boiler number 22335 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1953 01/10/1953 36 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 16/02/1955 25/03/1955 38 days General
Boiler number 22314 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 01/05/1956 16/06/1956 47 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 17/10/1957 16/11/1957 31 days General
Boiler number 22309 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1961 18/03/1961 37 days General
Boiler number 22302 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 25/03/1961 06/04/1961 13 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 19/04/1961 29/04/1961 11 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1863
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21840
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
17/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1928. Dep: 24/03/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6584
   
24/03/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
24/03/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
18/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
15/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1930. Dep: 31/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 868 (Diagram 15)
   
26/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1933. Dep: 21/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 487 (Diagram 15)
   
30/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1935. Dep: 30/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1458 (Diagram 15)
   
02/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1938. Dep: 07/05/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3248 (Diagram 15)
   
16/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3672 (Diagram 15D)
   
10/05/1941 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
01/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 01/01/1942. Dep: 01/01/1942.    
07/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1942. Dep: 12/12/1942.    
18/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/09/1943. Dep: 09/10/1943.    
09/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3667 (Diagram 15D)
   
05/03/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
16/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3770    
21/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1947. Dep: 09/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3679 (Diagram 15D)
   
14/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1949. Dep: 22/10/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3674 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63770
   
15/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
02/09/1951 Allocation Loaned to Southall (81C)    
16/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
17/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1952. Dep: 14/06/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22335 (Diagram 15D)
   
27/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/08/1953. Dep: 01/10/1953.    
16/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1955. Dep: 25/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22314 (Diagram 15D)
   
01/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/05/1956. Dep: 16/06/1956.    
17/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1957. Dep: 16/11/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22309 (Diagram 15D)
   
07/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
10/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1961. Dep: 18/03/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22302 (Diagram 15D)
   
25/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/03/1961. Dep: 06/04/1961.    
19/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/04/1961. Dep: 29/04/1961.    
19/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63770 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev