Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 526 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2433 Week
» 21215 Month
» 269508 Year
» 1153889 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1864 m/e 04/1918
LNER (1924) 6270   22/03/1924
LNER (1946) 3771   31/03/1946
BR 63771 w/e 18/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21841
To Service During 04/1918
Taken into Stock 22/03/1924
Withdrawal Sun 25/11/1962 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 44 yrs, 7 mths , 25 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 3/9/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 22/03/1924
ARD Ardsley 13/09/1924
NWE New England 24/02/1925
CLK Colwick 16/03/1925
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
SHF Sheffield Darnall 25/06/1945
41F Mexborough 31/01/1960
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 30/07/1961
   Withdrawn 25/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 05/08/1961
WDN   25/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1335)
06/09/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1302)
01/02/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1043)
18/06/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1954)
15/12/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1478)
10/04/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1133)
02/12/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1866)
01/11/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3292)
13/11/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3238)
07/09/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3205)
18/12/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3203)
26/01/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22238)
06/11/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22195)
29/03/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22186)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 08/03/1924 22/03/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6270
 
Gorton Works 14/06/1924 06/09/1924 85 days General
Boiler number 1302 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1927 13/08/1927 45 days General  
Gorton Works 11/01/1930 01/02/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1043 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1932 18/06/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1954 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1934 15/12/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1478 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1937 10/04/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1133 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/11/1939 02/12/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1866 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1941 01/11/1941 17 days General
Boiler number 3292 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1943 06/02/1943 23 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 02/11/1943 13/11/1943 12 days Heavy
Boiler number 3238 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1946 07/09/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3205 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1948 18/12/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63771
 
Gorton Works 05/01/1952 26/01/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22238 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/10/1954 06/11/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 22195 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/02/1958 29/03/1958 43 days General
Boiler number 22186 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1864
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21841
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
08/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1924. Dep: 22/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6270
   
22/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
14/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1924. Dep: 06/09/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1302 (Diagram 15)
   
13/09/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
24/02/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
16/03/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
30/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1927. Dep: 13/08/1927.    
11/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1930. Dep: 01/02/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1043 (Diagram 15)
   
04/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1932. Dep: 18/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1954 (Diagram 15)
   
01/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1934. Dep: 15/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1478 (Diagram 15)
   
27/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1937. Dep: 10/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1133 (Diagram 15)
   
18/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1939. Dep: 02/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1866 (Diagram 15)
   
16/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1941. Dep: 01/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3292 (Diagram 15)
   
15/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/01/1943. Dep: 06/02/1943.    
02/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/11/1943. Dep: 13/11/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3238 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
31/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3771    
17/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3205 (Diagram 15)
   
27/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1948. Dep: 18/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63771
   
05/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1952. Dep: 26/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22238 (Diagram 15)
   
09/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1954. Dep: 06/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22195 (Diagram 15)
   
15/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1958. Dep: 29/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22186 (Diagram 15)
   
31/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
30/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
25/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63771 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev