Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 168 Today
» 1008 Yesterday
» 6323 Week
» 16493 Month
» 294289 Year
» 1178670 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1866 m/e 04/1918
LNER (1924) 6585   22/10/1927
War Dept. 758   19/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21843
To Service During 04/1918
Taken into Stock 22/10/1927
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off Langwith Junction (LNG)
Service Life 23 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 758 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LNG Langwith Junction 22/10/1927
   Withdrawn 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1203)
09/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1043)
19/01/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1692)
08/05/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 859)
29/07/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1065)
27/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3220)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 23/07/1927 22/10/1927 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6585
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1929 09/11/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 25/06/1932 09/07/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1043 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/01/1935 19/01/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1692 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/04/1937 08/05/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 859 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1939 29/07/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 1065 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1941 27/09/1941 12 days General
Boiler number 3220 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 758
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1866
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21843
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
23/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1927. Dep: 22/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6585
   
22/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
22/10/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
05/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1929. Dep: 09/11/1929.    
25/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1932. Dep: 09/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1043 (Diagram 15)
   
05/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1935. Dep: 19/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1692 (Diagram 15)
   
24/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1937. Dep: 08/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 859 (Diagram 15)
   
22/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1939. Dep: 29/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1065 (Diagram 15)
   
16/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1941. Dep: 27/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3220 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 758
   
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 758 from Langwith Junction (LNG)    

prev prev