Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 653 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4784 Week
» 14954 Month
» 292750 Year
» 1177131 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1869 m/e 04/1918
LNER (1924) 6586   31/12/1927
LNER (1946) 3775   02/11/1946
BR 63775 w/e 21/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/304/1918
O4/724/08/1940
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21846
To Service During 04/1918
Taken into Stock 31/12/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/03/1962 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 43 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 24/3/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick 31/12/1927
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 22/11/1940
WFD Woodford Halse 24/07/1942
CLK Colwick 04/09/1942
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
GOR Gorton 25/06/1945
MEX Mexborough 08/07/1945
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 16/12/1945
36B Mexborough 27/08/1950
39A Gorton 20/01/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 24/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 27/08/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 26/01/1957
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 24/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1244)
06/09/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1036)
17/06/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1003)
14/12/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3226)
02/07/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3335)
24/08/1940 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3674)
14/03/1942 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3664)
24/06/1944 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3685)
02/11/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3674)
21/05/1949 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3678)
15/12/1951 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22326)
25/06/1955 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22338)
14/02/1959 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22301)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 01/10/1927 31/12/1927 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6586
 
Gorton Works 02/08/1930 06/09/1930 36 days General
Boiler number 1036 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1933 17/06/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 1003 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1935 14/12/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/06/1938 02/07/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 3335 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1940 24/08/1940 22 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3674 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 19/02/1942 14/03/1942 24 days General
Boiler number 3664 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1944 24/06/1944 8 days General
Boiler number 3685 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 19/10/1946 02/11/1946 15 days General
Boiler number 3674 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3775
 
Gorton Works 07/05/1949 21/05/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 3678 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63775
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1951 15/12/1951 15 days General
Boiler number 22326 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 21/05/1955 25/06/1955 36 days General
Boiler number 22338 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1959 14/02/1959 29 days General
Boiler number 22301 (Diagram 15D)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1869
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21846
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
01/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1927. Dep: 31/12/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6586
   
31/12/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
31/12/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
02/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1930. Dep: 06/09/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1036 (Diagram 15)
   
27/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1933. Dep: 17/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1003 (Diagram 15)
   
07/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1935. Dep: 14/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15)
   
11/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3335 (Diagram 15)
   
03/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1940. Dep: 24/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3674 (Diagram 15D)
   
22/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
19/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1942. Dep: 14/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3664 (Diagram 15D)
   
24/07/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
04/09/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
17/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3685 (Diagram 15D)
   
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
08/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
16/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
19/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3674 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3775
   
07/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1949. Dep: 21/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3678 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63775
   
27/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
01/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1951. Dep: 15/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22326 (Diagram 15D)
   
21/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1955. Dep: 25/06/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22338 (Diagram 15D)
   
20/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
17/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1959. Dep: 14/02/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22301 (Diagram 15D)
   
18/03/1962 Sightings Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside erecting shop.   Link
24/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63775 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev