Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 140 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1180 Week
» 11350 Month
» 289146 Year
» 1173527 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1870 m/e 04/1918
LNER (1924) 6267   09/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3776   30/11/1946
BR 63776 w/e 07/10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/304/1918
O4/830/04/1955
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21847
To Service During 04/1918
Taken into Stock 09/02/1924
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 44 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 21/02/1924
ANN Annesley 01/04/1924
MAR March 06/10/1931
MEX Mexborough 31/03/1932
40E Langwith Junction 02/07/1950
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 02/07/1950
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1205)
24/01/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1416)
22/06/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1379)
10/10/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1496)
06/10/1934 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
06/10/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1131)
24/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 817)
10/08/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 825)
10/04/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3398)
01/09/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3308)
10/01/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3391)
30/09/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22113)
10/01/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22889)
30/04/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28879)
01/06/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28847)
11/10/1958 Water Treatment apparatus fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/02/1924 09/02/1924 8 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6267
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1924 24/01/1925 64 days General
Boiler number 1416 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/05/1927 09/07/1927 50 days General  
Gorton Works 20/04/1929 22/06/1929 64 days General
Boiler number 1379 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/09/1931 10/10/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1496 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1934 06/10/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 10/07/1937 24/07/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 817 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1940 10/08/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 825 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1943 10/04/1943 15 days General
Boiler number 3398 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1945 01/09/1945 29 days General
Boiler number 3308 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/12/1947 10/01/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 3391 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/09/1950 30/09/1950 22 days General
Boiler number 22113 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63776
 
Gorton Works 04/10/1950 20/10/1950 17 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 23/10/1950 01/11/1950 10 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 05/07/1952 05/07/1952 1 day Unclassified
Tender changed
 
Gorton Works 13/12/1952 10/01/1953 29 days General
Boiler number 22889 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1955 30/04/1955 57 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28879 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 31/07/1955 13/08/1955 14 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 11/05/1957 01/06/1957 22 days General
Boiler number 28847 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1957 14/06/1957 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 26/09/1958 11/10/1958 16 days Unclassified
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1960 06/02/1960 29 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1870
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21847
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
02/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 09/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6267
   
09/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
21/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
01/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
22/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1924. Dep: 24/01/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1416 (Diagram 15)
   
21/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1927. Dep: 09/07/1927.    
20/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1929. Dep: 22/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1379 (Diagram 15)
   
19/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1931. Dep: 10/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1496 (Diagram 15)
   
06/10/1931 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
31/03/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
29/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1934. Dep: 06/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
10/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1937. Dep: 24/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 817 (Diagram 15)
   
03/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1940. Dep: 10/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 825 (Diagram 15)
   
27/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1943. Dep: 10/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3398 (Diagram 15)
   
04/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3308 (Diagram 15)
   
30/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3776    
13/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1947. Dep: 10/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3391 (Diagram 15)
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
09/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1950. Dep: 30/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22113 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63776
   
04/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/10/1950. Dep: 20/10/1950.    
23/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/10/1950. Dep: 01/11/1950.    
05/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/07/1952. Dep: 05/07/1952.
Work undertaken:
Tender changed
   
13/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1952. Dep: 10/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22889 (Diagram 15)
   
05/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1955. Dep: 30/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28879 (Diagram 100A)
   
31/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/07/1955. Dep: 13/08/1955.    
11/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1957. Dep: 01/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28847 (Diagram 100A)
   
13/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/06/1957. Dep: 14/06/1957.    
26/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/09/1958. Dep: 11/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
09/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/01/1960. Dep: 06/02/1960.    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63776 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev