Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1278 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7667 Week
» 28109 Month
» 364955 Year
» 1586520 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1873 m/e 05/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6504   22/08/1925
War Dept. 735   19/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21850
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 22/08/1925
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off Doncaster (DON)
Service Life 23 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 735 and sent to the Middle East via Swansea, 13/10/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1918
GOR Gorton on 20/08/1925
NWE New England on 02/09/1925
DON Doncaster on 05/11/1929
   Withdrawn on 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1301)
02/11/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1243)
15/08/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1464)
23/12/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1288)
19/10/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 853)
19/06/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1838)
05/08/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3276)
20/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3437)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/05/1925 22/08/1925 99 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6504
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1927 23/04/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 21/09/1929 02/11/1929 43 days General
Boiler number 1243 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1931 15/08/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1933 23/12/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1288 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1935 19/10/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1937 19/06/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1838 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1939 05/08/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 3276 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1941 20/09/1941 13 days General
Boiler number 3437 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 735
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1873
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21850
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
16/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1925. Dep: 22/08/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6504
   
20/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/08/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
02/09/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
12/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1927. Dep: 23/04/1927.    
21/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1929. Dep: 02/11/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1243 (Diagram 15)
   
05/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1931. Dep: 15/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15)
   
09/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1933. Dep: 23/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1288 (Diagram 15)
   
05/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1935. Dep: 19/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15)
   
05/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1937. Dep: 19/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1838 (Diagram 15)
   
29/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1939. Dep: 05/08/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3276 (Diagram 15)
   
08/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3437 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 735
   
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 735 from Doncaster (DON)    

prev prev