|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 16/05/1925 | 22/08/1925 | 99 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6504 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1927 | 23/04/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1929 | 02/11/1929 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1243 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/07/1931 | 15/08/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/12/1933 | 23/12/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1288 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1935 | 19/10/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1937 | 19/06/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1838 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1939 | 05/08/1939 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3276 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1941 | 20/09/1941 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 3437 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 735 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1873 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21850 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
16/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1925. Dep: 22/08/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6504 |
||
20/08/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/08/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
02/09/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
12/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1927. Dep: 23/04/1927. | ||
21/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1929. Dep: 02/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1243 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
25/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1931. Dep: 15/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1933. Dep: 23/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1288 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1935. Dep: 19/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1937. Dep: 19/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1838 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1939. Dep: 05/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3276 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3437 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 735 |
||
19/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 735 from Doncaster (DON) |