Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 346 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1271 Week
» 18607 Month
» 296403 Year
» 1180784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1874 m/e 05/1918
LNER (1924) 6587   05/11/1927
War Dept. 728   14/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21851
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 07/11/1927
Withdrawal Sun 14/09/1941 off Colwick (CLK)
Service Life 23 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 728 and sent to the Middle East via Glasgow 8/10/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 07/11/1927
CLK Colwick 09/08/1932
   Withdrawn 14/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1217)
22/02/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1331)
09/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1132)
04/08/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1201)
19/12/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3270)
13/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3419)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 20/08/1927 05/11/1927 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6587
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1930 22/02/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 1331 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1932 09/07/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1132 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1934 04/08/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1201 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/12/1936 19/12/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 3270 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1939 19/08/1939 29 days General  
Gorton Works 08/09/1941 13/09/1941 6 days General
Boiler number 3419 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1874
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21851
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
20/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1927. Dep: 05/11/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6587
   
07/11/1927 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
07/11/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
25/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1930. Dep: 22/02/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1331 (Diagram 15)
   
25/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1932. Dep: 09/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1132 (Diagram 15)
   
09/08/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
28/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1934. Dep: 04/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1201 (Diagram 15)
   
05/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1936. Dep: 19/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3270 (Diagram 15)
   
22/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1939. Dep: 19/08/1939.    
08/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3419 (Diagram 15)
   
14/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 728 from Colwick (CLK)    
14/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 728    

prev prev