Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 122 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7863 Week
» 28305 Month
» 365151 Year
» 1586716 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1876 m/e 05/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6505   01/08/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3780   30/06/1946
British Railways 63780 w/e 04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/305/1918
O128/04/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21853
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 01/08/1925
Withdrawal Sun 07/07/1963 off March (31B)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 45 yrs, 2 mths , 7 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 13/8/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1918
GOR Gorton on 28/07/1925
DON Doncaster on 13/08/1925
CLK Colwick on 08/11/1933
LNG Langwith Junction on 04/01/1937
GOR Gorton on 29/04/1945
CLK Colwick on 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton on 20/10/1946
38B Annesley on 20/10/1950
31B March on 10/02/1957
   Withdrawn on 07/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 28/10/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/02/1957
WDN   on 07/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1417)
03/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1173)
07/04/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1152)
11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1877)
10/03/1938 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
10/03/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3211)
09/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3408)
08/05/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3242)
29/04/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5034)
13/06/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5030)
21/05/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5086)
22/12/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28366)
26/03/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28375)
07/07/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28851)
09/08/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28971)
14/10/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28311)
14/10/1961 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 11/06/1925 01/08/1925 52 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6505
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1927 14/01/1928 15 days General  
Gorton Works 22/02/1930 07/03/1930 14 days General
Boiler number 1173 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/04/1932 04/1932   General  
Gorton Works 04/11/1935 11/1935   General  
Gorton Works 24/02/1938 10/03/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3211 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1940 09/1940   General  
Stratford Works 08/04/1943 08/05/1943 31 days General
Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1945 28/04/1945 71 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1947 13/06/1947 28 days General
Boiler number 5030 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1948 02/09/1948 3 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 07/05/1949 21/05/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 5086 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1951 22/12/1951 25 days General
Boiler number 28366 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1952 29/11/1952 53 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 25/02/1954 26/03/1954 30 days General
Boiler number 28375 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 29/12/1954 08/01/1955 11 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 28/04/1955 21/05/1955 24 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 17/05/1956 07/07/1956 52 days General
Boiler number 28851 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1958 09/08/1958 51 days General
Boiler number 28971 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1959 10/06/1959 9 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 30/07/1959 18/08/1959 20 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 05/09/1961 14/10/1961 40 days General
Boiler number 28311 (Diagram 100A)
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1876
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21853
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
11/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1925. Dep: 01/08/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6505
   
28/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
01/08/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
13/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
31/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1927. Dep: 14/01/1928.    
22/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1930. Dep: 07/03/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1173 (Diagram 15)
   
07/04/1932 Modification Diagram 15 number 1152 boiler fitted    
16/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1932. Dep: 00/04/1932.    
08/11/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
11/1935 Modification Diagram 15 number 1877 boiler fitted    
04/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1935. Dep: 00/11/1935.    
04/01/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
24/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1938. Dep: 10/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3211 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
09/1940 Modification Diagram 15 number 3408 boiler fitted    
24/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1940. Dep: 00/09/1940.    
08/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1943. Dep: 08/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 15)
   
17/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1945. Dep: 28/04/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
   
29/04/1945 Modification Diagram 100A number 5034 boiler fitted    
29/04/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3780    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
17/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1947. Dep: 13/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5030 (Diagram 100A)
   
31/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/08/1948. Dep: 02/09/1948.    
04/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63780    
07/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1949. Dep: 21/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5086 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
28/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1951. Dep: 22/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28366 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/10/1952. Dep: 29/11/1952.    
25/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1954. Dep: 26/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28375 (Diagram 100A)
   
29/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/12/1954. Dep: 08/01/1955.    
28/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/04/1955. Dep: 21/05/1955.    
17/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1956. Dep: 07/07/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28851 (Diagram 100A)
   
10/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
20/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1958. Dep: 09/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28971 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/06/1959. Dep: 10/06/1959.    
30/07/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/07/1959. Dep: 18/08/1959.    
05/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1961. Dep: 14/10/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28311 (Diagram 100A)
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
07/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63780 from March (31B)    

prev prev