Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 113 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1038 Week
» 18374 Month
» 296170 Year
» 1180551 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1878 m/e 05/1918
GCR 1269c   19/01/1924
LNER (1924) 6269   10/07/1924
LNER (1946) 3781   02/06/1946
BR 63781 w/e 23/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/305/1918
O4/819/04/1958
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21855
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 19/01/1924
Withdrawal Sun 17/04/1966 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping W George, Station Steel (Wath)
Service Life 47 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Station Steel, Wath, 5/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 17/01/1924
CLK Colwick 21/10/1945
ANN Annesley 18/04/1948
CLK Colwick 15/05/1949
38B Annesley 17/09/1950
39A Gorton 26/11/1950
38A Colwick 18/07/1954
36B Mexborough 29/01/1956
36C Frodingham 21/12/1958
40E Colwick 01/08/1965
36A Doncaster 26/12/1965
   Withdrawn 17/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 24/04/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 17/09/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 14/08/1954
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 40E Colwick 2w/e 07/08/1965
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 3w/e 01/01/1966
WDN   17/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1155)
10/07/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 547)
15/09/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1116)
28/10/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1303)
16/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1242)
08/06/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3236)
09/11/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3237)
27/03/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1021)
06/10/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3302)
12/11/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1118)
21/01/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3230)
05/07/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22276)
03/07/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22207)
19/04/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28809)
10/02/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28359)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 12/01/1924 19/01/1924 8 days Light Repair
Renumbered to GCR 1269c
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1924 10/07/1924 56 days General
Boiler number 547 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6269
 
Gorton Works 02/08/1927 24/09/1927 54 days General  
Gorton Works 28/06/1929 08/08/1929 42 days General  
Gorton Works 08/08/1931 15/09/1931 39 days General
Boiler number 1116 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1933 28/10/1933 41 days General
Boiler number 1303 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/10/1935 16/11/1935 44 days General
Boiler number 1242 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/04/1938 08/06/1938 49 days General
Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1940 09/11/1940 25 days General
Boiler number 3237 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1943 27/03/1943 44 days General
Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1945 06/10/1945 42 days General
Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/10/1947 12/11/1947 34 days General
Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1948 23/10/1948 40 days Heavy
Renumbered to BR 63781
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1949 21/01/1950 41 days General
Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/01/1950 26/01/1950 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 09/06/1952 05/07/1952 27 days General
Boiler number 22276 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1954 03/07/1954 27 days General
Boiler number 22207 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/02/1958 19/04/1958 52 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28809 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 05/05/1958 10/05/1958 6 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 15/01/1962 10/02/1962 27 days General
Boiler number 28359 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1878
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21855
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/01/1924. Dep: 19/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to GCR 1269c
   
17/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
19/01/1924 To Stock To GCR stock    
16/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1924. Dep: 10/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 547 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6269
   
02/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1927. Dep: 24/09/1927.    
28/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1929. Dep: 08/08/1929.    
08/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1931. Dep: 15/09/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1116 (Diagram 15)
   
18/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1933. Dep: 28/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1303 (Diagram 15)
   
04/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1935. Dep: 16/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1242 (Diagram 15)
   
21/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1938. Dep: 08/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 15)
   
16/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1940. Dep: 09/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3237 (Diagram 15)
   
12/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1943. Dep: 27/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15)
   
26/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 15)
   
21/10/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
02/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3781    
10/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1947. Dep: 12/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15)
   
18/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
14/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/09/1948. Dep: 23/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63781
   
15/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
12/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1949. Dep: 21/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15)
   
24/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/01/1950. Dep: 26/01/1950.    
17/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
09/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1952. Dep: 05/07/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22276 (Diagram 15)
   
07/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22207 (Diagram 15)
   
18/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
27/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1958. Dep: 19/04/1958.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28809 (Diagram 100A)
   
05/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/05/1958. Dep: 10/05/1958.    
21/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
15/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1962. Dep: 10/02/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28359 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/03/1962 Sightings Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
08/11/1964 Sightings A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed John Thickitt Link
01/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
26/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
17/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 63781 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev