|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/01/1924 | 19/01/1924 | 8 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to GCR 1269c |
||
Gorton Works | 16/05/1924 | 10/07/1924 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 547 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6269 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/08/1927 | 24/09/1927 | 54 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/06/1929 | 08/08/1929 | 42 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1931 | 15/09/1931 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 1116 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/09/1933 | 28/10/1933 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 1303 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1935 | 16/11/1935 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 1242 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/04/1938 | 08/06/1938 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1940 | 09/11/1940 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3237 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1943 | 27/03/1943 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1945 | 06/10/1945 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/10/1947 | 12/11/1947 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1948 | 23/10/1948 | 40 days | Heavy | Renumbered to BR 63781 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1949 | 21/01/1950 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/01/1950 | 26/01/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 09/06/1952 | 05/07/1952 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 22276 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1954 | 03/07/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 22207 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/02/1958 | 19/04/1958 | 52 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28809 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1958 | 10/05/1958 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1962 | 10/02/1962 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28359 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/03/1962 | Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: E26011/34, E27005, 63689, 63720/81, 90013/101/30/3/280/300/1/2, 90447/84, 90541/611/65/730, 92014/92/102. Outside Erecting Shop: E26000/26/33/47, 64744, 63612, 63730/62, 63775, 90103. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1878 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21855 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/01/1924. Dep: 19/01/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to GCR 1269c |
||
17/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
19/01/1924 | To Stock | To GCR stock | ||
16/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1924. Dep: 10/07/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 547 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6269 |
||
02/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1927. Dep: 24/09/1927. | ||
28/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1929. Dep: 08/08/1929. | ||
08/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1931. Dep: 15/09/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1116 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1933. Dep: 28/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1303 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1935. Dep: 16/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1242 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1938. Dep: 08/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1940. Dep: 09/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3237 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1943. Dep: 27/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/10/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
02/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3781 | ||
10/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1947. Dep: 12/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
24/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
14/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/09/1948. Dep: 23/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63781 |
||
15/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
21/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
12/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1949. Dep: 21/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/01/1950. Dep: 26/01/1950. | ||
17/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
09/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1952. Dep: 05/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22276 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22207 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
29/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
27/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1958. Dep: 19/04/1958. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28809 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/05/1958. Dep: 10/05/1958. | ||
21/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
15/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1962. Dep: 10/02/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28359 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/08/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
26/12/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
17/04/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63781 from Doncaster (36A) |