Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 153 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 153 Week
» 18935 Month
» 267228 Year
» 1151609 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1879 m/e 05/1918
LNER (1924) 6506   04/07/1925
LNER (1946) 3782   13/10/1946
BR 63782 w/e 28/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21856
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 04/07/1925
Withdrawal Thu 25/05/1961 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Service Life 43 yrs , 25 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 02/07/1925
WFD Woodford Halse 10/07/1925
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 08/12/1926
STV Staveley (G.C.) m/e 1928
MAR March 02/03/1929
DON Doncaster 15/08/1930
MAR March 27/09/1930
CAM Cambridge 25/10/1931
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 18/10/1941
   Withdrawn 25/05/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   25/05/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1338)
05/01/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1457)
14/02/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1328)
14/10/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1023)
09/05/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1053)
09/05/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
29/10/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1264)
15/03/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1881)
08/08/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3301)
02/09/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1095)
25/01/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3293)
28/05/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3278)
10/11/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22224)
28/11/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22198)
11/02/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22116)
25/10/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22265)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 04/04/1925 04/07/1925 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6506
 
Gorton Works 09/10/1926 20/11/1926 43 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 13/10/1928 05/01/1929 85 days General
Boiler number 1457 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/01/1931 14/02/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1328 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1933 14/10/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1936 09/05/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1053 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1938 29/10/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 1264 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/02/1939 11/03/1939 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 08/03/1941 15/03/1941 8 days General
Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1942 08/08/1942 16 days General
Boiler number 3301 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1944 02/09/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 1095 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1946 25/01/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1949 28/05/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 3278 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63782
 
Gorton Works 19/06/1949 20/06/1949 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 20/10/1951 10/11/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 22224 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/11/1953 28/11/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22198 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1956 11/02/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 22116 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/09/1958 25/10/1958 36 days General
Boiler number 22265 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1961 16/05/1961 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1879
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21856
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
04/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1925. Dep: 04/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6506
   
02/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
04/07/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
10/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
09/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/10/1926. Dep: 20/11/1926.    
08/12/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
1928 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
13/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1928. Dep: 05/01/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1457 (Diagram 15)
   
02/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
15/08/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
27/09/1930 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
31/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1931. Dep: 14/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1328 (Diagram 15)
   
25/10/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
07/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1933. Dep: 14/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15)
   
25/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1053 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
01/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1938. Dep: 29/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1264 (Diagram 15)
   
25/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/02/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939.    
08/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1941. Dep: 15/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15)
   
18/10/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
24/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1942. Dep: 08/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3301 (Diagram 15)
   
19/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1944. Dep: 02/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1095 (Diagram 15)
   
13/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3782    
28/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 15)
   
14/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1949. Dep: 28/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3278 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63782
   
19/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/06/1949. Dep: 20/06/1949.    
20/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1951. Dep: 10/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22224 (Diagram 15)
   
07/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22198 (Diagram 15)
   
14/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1956. Dep: 11/02/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22116 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1958. Dep: 25/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22265 (Diagram 15)
   
16/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 16/05/1961. Dep: 16/05/1961.    
25/05/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 63782 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev