|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 19/11/1927 | 18/02/1928 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6589 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1929 | 25/01/1930 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1932 | 28/05/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1082 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1935 | 26/01/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1056 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/05/1937 | 29/05/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 822 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1939 | 25/11/1939 | 15 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/05/1942 | 16/05/1942 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1104 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1944 | 04/03/1944 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 3277 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1946 | 14/09/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3201 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1948 | 11/12/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63783 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1951 | 03/11/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22221 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/11/1951 | 10/11/1951 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1954 | 02/10/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22282 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/10/1954 | 15/10/1954 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1957 | 07/12/1957 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 11/12/1957 | 14/12/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 06/09/1958 | 04/10/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22258 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1958 | 17/10/1958 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 24/10/1958 | 28/10/1958 | 5 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1880 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21857 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2896 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
19/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1927. Dep: 18/02/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6589 |
||
16/02/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
16/02/1928 | To Stock | To LNWR stock | ||
28/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1929. Dep: 25/01/1930. | ||
14/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1932. Dep: 28/05/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1082 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/02/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
19/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1935. Dep: 26/01/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1056 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
15/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1937. Dep: 29/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 822 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/07/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
11/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1939. Dep: 25/11/1939. | ||
09/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1942. Dep: 16/05/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1104 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1944. Dep: 04/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3277 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/08/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
03/02/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3783 | ||
24/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1946. Dep: 14/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3201 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1948. Dep: 11/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63783 |
||
06/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
12/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
13/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1951. Dep: 03/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22221 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/11/1951. Dep: 10/11/1951. | ||
04/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1954. Dep: 02/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22282 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1954. Dep: 15/10/1954. | ||
09/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/11/1957. Dep: 07/12/1957. | ||
11/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/12/1957. Dep: 14/12/1957. | ||
06/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1958. Dep: 04/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22258 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/10/1958. Dep: 17/10/1958. | ||
24/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/10/1958. Dep: 28/10/1958. | ||
09/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63783 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |