Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 7 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 3395 Week
» 16428 Month
» 238829 Year
» 1123210 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1882 m/e 05/1918
LNWR 2897 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6590   06/01/1928
LNER (1946) 3785   17/08/1946
BR 63785 w/e 19/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/305/1918
O4/804/11/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21859
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 06/01/1928
Withdrawal Sun 27/03/1966 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 47 yrs, 10 mths , 25 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 5/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
NWE New England 06/01/1928
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 16/07/1929
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 20/03/1934
36A Doncaster 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn 27/03/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 27/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 825)
05/12/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1034)
03/03/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1875)
11/04/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
11/04/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1050)
05/10/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1130)
12/10/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1135)
03/10/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3385)
04/11/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5027)
17/08/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5007)
19/02/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5028)
26/05/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28317)
29/08/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28321)
12/05/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28895)
16/02/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28880)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 12/11/1927 06/01/1928 56 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6590
 
Gorton Works 05/05/1929 16/07/1929 73 days General  
Gorton Works 26/10/1931 05/12/1931 41 days General
Boiler number 1034 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/01/1934 03/03/1934 34 days General
Boiler number 1875 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1936 11/04/1936 31 days General
Boiler number 1050 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1938 05/10/1938 61 days General
Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1940 12/10/1940 26 days General
Boiler number 1135 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/09/1942 03/10/1942 28 days General
Boiler number 3385 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1944 04/11/1944 44 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5027 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/06/1946 17/08/1946 61 days General
Boiler number 5007 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3785
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1949 19/02/1949 42 days General
Boiler number 5028 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63785
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1949 24/03/1949 15 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 25/04/1951 26/05/1951 32 days General
Boiler number 28317 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1951 01/06/1951 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 01/08/1953 29/08/1953 29 days General
Boiler number 28321 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 01/04/1954 01/05/1954 31 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 10/04/1956 12/05/1956 33 days General
Boiler number 28895 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1959 16/02/1959 33 days General
Boiler number 28880 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1960 14/05/1960 45 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 07/05/1962 22/06/1962 47 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1882
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21859
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2897    
08/1921 Allocation      
12/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1927. Dep: 06/01/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6590
   
06/01/1928 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
06/01/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
05/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1929. Dep: 16/07/1929.    
16/07/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
26/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1931. Dep: 05/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1034 (Diagram 15)
   
29/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1934. Dep: 03/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1875 (Diagram 15)
   
20/03/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
12/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1936. Dep: 11/04/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1050 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
06/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1938. Dep: 05/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15)
   
17/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1940. Dep: 12/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1135 (Diagram 15)
   
06/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1942. Dep: 03/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3385 (Diagram 15)
   
22/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1944. Dep: 04/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5027 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5007 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3785
   
09/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1949. Dep: 19/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5028 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63785
   
10/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/03/1949. Dep: 24/03/1949.    
25/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1951. Dep: 26/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28317 (Diagram 100A)
   
31/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/05/1951. Dep: 01/06/1951.    
01/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1953. Dep: 29/08/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28321 (Diagram 100A)
   
01/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/04/1954. Dep: 01/05/1954.    
10/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1956. Dep: 12/05/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28895 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1959. Dep: 16/02/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28880 (Diagram 100A)
   
31/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/03/1960. Dep: 14/05/1960.    
07/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/05/1962. Dep: 22/06/1962.    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
27/03/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 63785 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev