|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/11/1927 | 06/01/1928 | 56 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6590 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1929 | 16/07/1929 | 73 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/10/1931 | 05/12/1931 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 1034 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1934 | 03/03/1934 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 1875 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1936 | 11/04/1936 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 1050 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1938 | 05/10/1938 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/09/1940 | 12/10/1940 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 1135 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/09/1942 | 03/10/1942 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 3385 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1944 | 04/11/1944 | 44 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5027 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/06/1946 | 17/08/1946 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 5007 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3785 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1949 | 19/02/1949 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 5028 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63785 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1949 | 24/03/1949 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1951 | 26/05/1951 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28317 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1951 | 01/06/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1953 | 29/08/1953 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28321 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/04/1954 | 01/05/1954 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 10/04/1956 | 12/05/1956 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28895 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1959 | 16/02/1959 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28880 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1960 | 14/05/1960 | 45 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1962 | 22/06/1962 | 47 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1882 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21859 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2897 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
12/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1927. Dep: 06/01/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6590 |
||
06/01/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
06/01/1928 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
05/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1929. Dep: 16/07/1929. | ||
16/07/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
26/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1931. Dep: 05/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1034 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1934. Dep: 03/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1875 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/03/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
12/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1936. Dep: 11/04/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1050 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
06/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1938. Dep: 05/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1940. Dep: 12/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1135 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1942. Dep: 03/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3385 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1944. Dep: 04/11/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5027 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5007 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3785 |
||
09/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1949. Dep: 19/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5028 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63785 |
||
10/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/03/1949. Dep: 24/03/1949. | ||
25/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1951. Dep: 26/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28317 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/05/1951. Dep: 01/06/1951. | ||
01/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1953. Dep: 29/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28321 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/04/1954. Dep: 01/05/1954. | ||
10/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1956. Dep: 12/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28895 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1959. Dep: 16/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28880 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/03/1960. Dep: 14/05/1960. | ||
07/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/05/1962. Dep: 22/06/1962. | ||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
27/03/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63785 from Doncaster (36A) |