Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1885 m/e 06/1918
LNER (1924) 6591   11/08/1928
LNER (1946) 3787   21/09/1946
BR 63787 w/e 12/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21862
To Service During 06/1918
Taken into Stock 14/08/1928
Withdrawal Fri 08/06/1962 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 44 yrs , 8 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster 14/08/1928
LNG Langwith Junction 14/05/1943
CLK Colwick 19/09/1944
ANN Annesley 18/12/1949
CLK Colwick 08/01/1950
38B Annesley 08/10/1950
39A Gorton 26/11/1950
38D Staveley (G.C.) 04/05/1952
   Withdrawn 08/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC CLX   w/e 14/01/1950
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 17/05/1952
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
WDN   08/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1749)
08/02/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1153)
19/12/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 803)
23/06/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1330)
15/08/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
15/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1215)
05/11/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3258)
21/12/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1350)
15/08/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3277)
22/01/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1882)
21/09/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3345)
12/02/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3256)
19/05/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22186)
10/10/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22201)
04/02/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22210)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 12/05/1928 11/08/1928 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6591
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1930 08/02/1930 15 days General
Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/12/1931 19/12/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 803 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1934 23/06/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1330 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/08/1936 15/08/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1215 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 22/10/1938 05/11/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3258 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1940 21/12/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 1350 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1942 15/08/1942 10 days General
Boiler number 3277 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/12/1943 22/01/1944 24 days General
Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1946 21/09/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3345 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3787
 
Gorton Works 04/10/1947 11/10/1947 8 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 29/01/1949 12/02/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 3256 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63787
 
Gorton Works 28/04/1951 19/05/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 22186 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/05/1951 23/05/1951 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 26/09/1953 10/10/1953 15 days General
Boiler number 22201 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1953 17/10/1953 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 14/01/1956 04/02/1956 22 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22210 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/01/1957 06/04/1957 81 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 09/04/1957 20/04/1957 12 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 03/05/1957 22/05/1957 20 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 27/02/1960 02/04/1960 36 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 05/06/1962 05/06/1962 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1885
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21862
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1928. Dep: 11/08/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6591
   
14/08/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
14/08/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
25/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1930. Dep: 08/02/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15)
   
05/12/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1931. Dep: 19/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 803 (Diagram 15)
   
09/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1330 (Diagram 15)
   
01/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1936. Dep: 15/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1215 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
22/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3258 (Diagram 15)
   
07/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1940. Dep: 21/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1350 (Diagram 15)
   
06/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1942. Dep: 15/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3277 (Diagram 15)
   
14/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
30/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1943. Dep: 22/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15)
   
19/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
31/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3345 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3787
   
04/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/10/1947. Dep: 11/10/1947.    
29/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1949. Dep: 12/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3256 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63787
   
18/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
08/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
28/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1951. Dep: 19/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22186 (Diagram 15)
   
21/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/05/1951. Dep: 23/05/1951.    
04/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
26/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1953. Dep: 10/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22201 (Diagram 15)
   
13/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/10/1953. Dep: 17/10/1953.    
14/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 14/01/1956. Dep: 04/02/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22210 (Diagram 15)
   
16/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 16/01/1957. Dep: 06/04/1957.    
09/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1957. Dep: 20/04/1957.    
03/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/05/1957. Dep: 22/05/1957.    
27/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/02/1960. Dep: 02/04/1960.    
05/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 05/06/1962. Dep: 05/06/1962.    
08/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63787 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev