Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 393 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6202 Week
» 13386 Month
» 321367 Year
» 1205748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1887 m/e 07/1918
LNWR 2980 m/e 01/1921
LNER (1924) 6593   14/07/1928
War Dept. 745   13/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21864
To Service During 07/1918
Taken into Stock 21/07/1928
Withdrawal Sat 13/09/1941 off Doncaster (DON)
Service Life 23 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 745 and sent to the Middle East via Ellesmere Port, 17/10/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   01/1921
NWE New England 21/07/1928
MAR March 15/03/1932
CAM Cambridge 09/06/1932
DON Doncaster 14/04/1936
   Withdrawn 13/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1282)
13/08/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1968)
18/05/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1205)
03/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1962)
12/08/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 940)
20/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3436)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 14/04/1928 14/07/1928 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6593
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1930 17/06/1930 67 days General  
Gorton Works 18/04/1931 18/04/1931 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 06/06/1931 13/06/1931 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 30/07/1932 13/08/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1935 18/05/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1937 03/07/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 1962 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/07/1939 12/08/1939 29 days General
Boiler number 940 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/09/1941 20/09/1941 10 days General
Boiler number 3436 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 745
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1887
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21864
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
01/1921 Allocation      
01/1921 Renumbered Renumbered to 2980    
14/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1928. Dep: 14/07/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6593
   
21/07/1928 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
21/07/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
12/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1930. Dep: 17/06/1930.    
18/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/04/1931. Dep: 18/04/1931.    
06/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/06/1931. Dep: 13/06/1931.    
15/03/1932 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
09/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
30/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1932. Dep: 13/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15)
   
11/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1935. Dep: 18/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 15)
   
14/04/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1937. Dep: 03/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1962 (Diagram 15)
   
15/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1939. Dep: 12/08/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 940 (Diagram 15)
   
11/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3436 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 745
   
13/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 745 from Doncaster (DON)    

prev prev