|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 15/03/1924 | 22/03/1924 | 8 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6280 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/07/1924 | 16/12/1924 | 160 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/06/1927 | 04/08/1927 | 42 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/09/1929 | 28/11/1929 | 88 days | General | Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/09/1931 | 23/10/1931 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 1379 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1934 | 17/03/1934 | 34 days | General | Altered spring gear for working To Whitemoor Boiler number C1470 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/09/1935 | 12/10/1935 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 867 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/10/1937 | 13/11/1937 | 21 days | General | Altered chimney Boiler number 1281 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/09/1939 | 28/10/1939 | 39 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1941 | 03/05/1941 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 3252 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1942 | 07/11/1942 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 3390 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1946 | 05/01/1946 | -296 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1947 | 15/01/1948 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 1041 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1950 | 16/09/1950 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 22104 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63793 |
||
Gorton Works | 20/09/1950 | 22/09/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1952 | 06/09/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22291 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1955 | 31/03/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 22885 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1958 | 12/04/1958 | 51 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28948 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1961 | 18/04/1961 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 11/04/1962 | 19/04/1962 | 9 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1896 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21873 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
15/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/03/1924. Dep: 22/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6280 |
||
22/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
10/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1924. Dep: 16/12/1924. | ||
23/12/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1927. Dep: 04/08/1927. | ||
02/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1929. Dep: 28/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1931. Dep: 23/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1379 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1934. Dep: 17/03/1934. Work undertaken: Altered spring gear for working To Whitemoor Boiler number C1470 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1935. Dep: 12/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 867 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1937. Dep: 13/11/1937. Work undertaken: Altered chimney Boiler number 1281 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1939. Dep: 28/10/1939. | ||
12/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1941. Dep: 03/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3252 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1942. Dep: 07/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3390 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
05/01/1946 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 3413 boiler fitted | ||
29/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3793 | ||
29/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1946. Dep: 05/01/1946. | ||
07/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1947. Dep: 15/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1041 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1950. Dep: 16/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22104 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63793 |
||
20/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/09/1950. Dep: 22/09/1950. | ||
09/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1952. Dep: 06/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22291 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1955. Dep: 31/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22885 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1958. Dep: 12/04/1958. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28948 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/03/1961. Dep: 18/04/1961. | ||
11/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/04/1962. Dep: 19/04/1962. | ||
09/05/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63793 from Frodingham (36C) |