Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 115 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1040 Week
» 18376 Month
» 296172 Year
» 1180553 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1898 m/e 02/1918
LNER (1924) 6277   05/04/1924
LNER (1946) 3794   28/07/1946
BR 63794 w/e 16/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/302/1918
O4/703/04/1943
O4/818/05/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21875
To Service During 02/1918
Taken into Stock 05/04/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/11/1962 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 44 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 11/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 05/04/1924
DON Doncaster 29/11/1924
MEX Mexborough 28/10/1936
LNG Langwith Junction 06/05/1937
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 24/11/1940
GOR Gorton 07/02/1943
LNG Langwith Junction 03/04/1943
CLK Colwick 27/10/1946
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
39A Gorton 16/07/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 03/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 16/07/1950
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 03/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1366)
29/11/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1153)
30/11/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1367)
21/11/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1204)
06/01/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1208)
09/05/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1358)
09/04/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3323)
20/07/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1200)
03/04/1943 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3675)
01/09/1945 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 5103)
28/06/1947 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3689)
29/10/1949 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3688)
19/04/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22332)
09/10/1954 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22317)
18/05/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28932)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/03/1924 05/04/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6277
 
Gorton Works 19/07/1924 29/11/1924 134 days General
Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/07/1927 20/08/1927 36 days General  
Gorton Works 26/10/1929 30/11/1929 36 days General
Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/11/1931 21/11/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1204 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1933 06/01/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1208 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1936 09/05/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1358 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1938 09/04/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3323 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1940 20/07/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 1200 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1943 03/04/1943 19 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3675 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 01/11/1944 11/11/1944 11 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1945 01/09/1945 29 days General
Boiler number 5103 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1947 28/06/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 3689 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1948 16/10/1948 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63794
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1949 29/10/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 3688 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1952 19/04/1952 29 days General
Boiler number 22332 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1953 03/10/1953 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 04/09/1954 09/10/1954 36 days General
Boiler number 22317 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 22/10/1955 26/10/1955 5 days Weighing  
Gorton Works 20/04/1957 18/05/1957 29 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28932 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1957 12/10/1957 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 11/06/1960 09/07/1960 29 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 04/11/1961 18/11/1961 15 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1898
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21875
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
22/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/03/1924. Dep: 05/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6277
   
05/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/04/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
19/07/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1924. Dep: 29/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15)
   
29/11/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
16/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1927. Dep: 20/08/1927.    
26/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1929. Dep: 30/11/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 15)
   
07/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1931. Dep: 21/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1204 (Diagram 15)
   
23/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1933. Dep: 06/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1208 (Diagram 15)
   
25/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1358 (Diagram 15)
   
28/10/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
06/05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
26/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1938. Dep: 09/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3323 (Diagram 15)
   
13/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1940. Dep: 20/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1200 (Diagram 15)
   
24/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
07/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
16/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1943. Dep: 03/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3675 (Diagram 15D)
   
03/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
01/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/11/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
04/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5103 (Diagram 15D)
   
28/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3794    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
07/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1947. Dep: 28/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3689 (Diagram 15D)
   
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
02/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/10/1948. Dep: 16/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63794
   
08/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1949. Dep: 29/10/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3688 (Diagram 15D)
   
16/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
22/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1952. Dep: 19/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22332 (Diagram 15D)
   
02/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/10/1953. Dep: 03/10/1953.    
04/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1954. Dep: 09/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22317 (Diagram 15D)
   
22/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Weighing) - Arr: 22/10/1955. Dep: 26/10/1955.    
20/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1957. Dep: 18/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28932 (Diagram 100A)
   
05/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/10/1957. Dep: 12/10/1957.    
11/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/06/1960. Dep: 09/07/1960.    
04/11/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/11/1961. Dep: 18/11/1961.    
03/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63794 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev