Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 106 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 5915 Week
» 13099 Month
» 321080 Year
» 1205461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1902 m/e 03/1918
LNER (1924) 6596   11/02/1928
LNER (1946) 3796   27/04/1946
BR 63796 w/e 04/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/303/1918
O127/04/1946
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21879
To Service During 03/1918
Taken into Stock 10/02/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/10/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 44 yrs, 7 mths , 28 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Derby for cutting up 9/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster 10/02/1928
TUX Tuxford 04/08/1939
FRO Frodingham 05/05/1946
GOR Gorton 12/05/1946
CLK Colwick 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton 20/10/1946
38B Annesley 22/10/1950
31B March 17/02/1957
38B Annesley 14/04/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 27/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 28/10/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 20/04/1957
LOAN 16D Annesley 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 27/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1265)
31/12/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 486)
14/07/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1015)
14/07/1934 Wakefield 2C Lubricator added to axles
25/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1325)
20/08/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 856)
25/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3430)
19/12/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1271)
27/04/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5055)
04/12/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5080)
02/06/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28322)
31/10/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28396)
14/01/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28888)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 15/10/1927 11/02/1928 120 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6596
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1930 08/02/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 12/12/1931 31/12/1931 20 days General
Boiler number 486 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1934 14/07/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1015 (Diagram 15)
Wakefield 2C Lubricator added to axles
 
Gorton Works 11/07/1936 25/07/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1325 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/08/1938 20/08/1938 8 days General
Boiler number 856 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1941 25/01/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 3430 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/12/1942 19/12/1942 16 days General
Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1946 27/04/1946 85 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5055 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3796
 
Gorton Works 11/09/1947 16/10/1947 36 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 31/10/1948 04/12/1948 35 days General
Boiler number 5080 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63796
 
Gorton Works 02/05/1951 02/06/1951 32 days General
Boiler number 28322 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 26/05/1952 05/07/1952 41 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 05/10/1953 31/10/1953 27 days General
Boiler number 28396 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 26/07/1954 28/08/1954 34 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 14/12/1954 29/01/1955 47 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 03/12/1955 14/01/1956 43 days General
Boiler number 28888 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 11/12/1957 01/02/1958 53 days General  
Gorton Works 30/03/1960 14/05/1960 46 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1902
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21879
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
15/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1927. Dep: 11/02/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6596
   
10/02/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
10/02/1928 To Stock To ROD stock    
11/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1930. Dep: 08/02/1930.    
12/12/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1931. Dep: 31/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 486 (Diagram 15)
   
30/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1934. Dep: 14/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1015 (Diagram 15)
Wakefield 2C Lubricator added to axles
   
11/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1936. Dep: 25/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1325 (Diagram 15)
   
13/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1938. Dep: 20/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 856 (Diagram 15)
   
04/08/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX)    
11/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1941. Dep: 25/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3430 (Diagram 15)
   
04/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1942. Dep: 19/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 15)
   
02/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1946. Dep: 27/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5055 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3796
   
05/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
12/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
11/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/09/1947. Dep: 16/10/1947.    
31/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1948. Dep: 04/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5080 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63796
   
22/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
02/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1951. Dep: 02/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28322 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/05/1952. Dep: 05/07/1952.    
05/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1953. Dep: 31/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28396 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/07/1954. Dep: 28/08/1954.    
14/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/12/1954. Dep: 29/01/1955.    
03/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1955. Dep: 14/01/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28888 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
14/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
11/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1957. Dep: 01/02/1958.    
30/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/03/1960. Dep: 14/05/1960.    
27/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63796 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev