Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 168 Today
» 1008 Yesterday
» 6323 Week
» 16493 Month
» 294289 Year
» 1178670 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1903 m/e 03/1918
LNWR 2877 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6597   23/07/1927
War Dept. 707   13/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21880
To Service During 03/1918
Taken into Stock 23/07/1927
Withdrawal Sat 13/09/1941 off Langwith Junction (LNG)
Service Life 23 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 707 and sent to the Middle East via Glasgow 16/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
LNG Langwith Junction 23/07/1927
   Withdrawn 13/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1113)
02/04/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1448)
22/09/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 945)
22/09/1934 Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles
19/12/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3269)
18/02/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 931)
23/08/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3367)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/04/1927 23/07/1927 99 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6597
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1929 28/09/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 19/03/1932 02/04/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1448 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 1934 22/09/1934   General
Boiler number 945 (Diagram 15)
Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles
 
Gorton Works 05/12/1936 19/12/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/02/1939 18/02/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 931 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1941 23/08/1941 20 days General
Boiler number 3367 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1903
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21880
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2877    
08/1921 Allocation      
16/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1927. Dep: 23/07/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6597
   
23/07/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
23/07/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
17/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1929. Dep: 28/09/1929.    
19/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1932. Dep: 02/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1448 (Diagram 15)
   
1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1934. Dep: 22/09/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 945 (Diagram 15)
Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles
   
05/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1936. Dep: 19/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 15)
   
11/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1939. Dep: 18/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 931 (Diagram 15)
   
04/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1941. Dep: 23/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3367 (Diagram 15)
   
13/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 707 from Langwith Junction (LNG)    
13/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 707    

prev prev