|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 16/04/1927 | 23/07/1927 | 99 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6597 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1929 | 28/09/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1932 | 02/04/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1448 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 1934 | 22/09/1934 | General | Boiler number 945 (Diagram 15) Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles |
|||
Gorton Works | 05/12/1936 | 19/12/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/02/1939 | 18/02/1939 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 931 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1941 | 23/08/1941 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 3367 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1903 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21880 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2877 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
16/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1927. Dep: 23/07/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6597 |
||
23/07/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
23/07/1927 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
17/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1929. Dep: 28/09/1929. | ||
19/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1932. Dep: 02/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1448 (Diagram 15) |
||
1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1934. Dep: 22/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 945 (Diagram 15) Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles |
||
05/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1936. Dep: 19/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1939. Dep: 18/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 931 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1941. Dep: 23/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3367 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 707 from Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
13/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 707 |