Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 729 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3872 Week
» 14042 Month
» 291838 Year
» 1176219 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1905 m/e 03/1918
LNWR 2869 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6517   31/10/1925
War Dept. 726   05/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21882
To Service During 03/1918
Taken into Stock 31/10/1925
Withdrawal Sun 05/10/1941 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)
Service Life 23 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 726 and sent to the Middle East via Glasgow 8/10/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 29/10/1925
WFD Woodford Halse 07/11/1925
IMM Immingham 03/09/1929
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 10/06/1939
   Withdrawn 05/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1033)
18/02/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 856)
23/01/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1090)
18/08/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 803)
05/09/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3260)
05/09/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
12/11/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 815)
11/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3426)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 11/07/1925 31/10/1925 113 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6517
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1928 18/02/1928 29 days General
Boiler number 856 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1929 31/08/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 09/01/1932 23/01/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1090 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1934 18/08/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 803 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1936 05/09/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 3260 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1938 12/11/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1940 11/01/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 3426 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1905
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21882
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2869    
08/1921 Allocation      
11/07/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1925. Dep: 31/10/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6517
   
29/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
31/10/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
07/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
21/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1928. Dep: 18/02/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 856 (Diagram 15)
   
03/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1929. Dep: 31/08/1929.    
03/09/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
09/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1932. Dep: 23/01/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1090 (Diagram 15)
   
28/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1934. Dep: 18/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 803 (Diagram 15)
   
22/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1936. Dep: 05/09/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3260 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
29/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1938. Dep: 12/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15)
   
10/06/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
28/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1940. Dep: 11/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3426 (Diagram 15)
   
05/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 726 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
05/10/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 726    

prev prev