|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/04/1925 | 06/06/1925 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6511 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/07/1927 | 09/08/1927 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 1363 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/07/1929 | 10/09/1929 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 1947 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/06/1931 | 06/08/1931 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 1072 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1933 | 30/12/1933 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1935 | 19/10/1935 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 1880 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1937 | 04/11/1937 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 1443 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1939 | 25/11/1939 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 1276 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/01/1942 | 31/01/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/03/1944 | 22/04/1944 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 3395 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/04/1946 | 01/06/1946 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 1065 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3800 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1948 | 11/06/1948 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 3343 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63800 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/09/1950 | 14/10/1950 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 22117 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1952 | 27/12/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 22888 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1954 | 11/12/1954 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 22272 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1957 | 22/06/1957 | 51 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28934 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1958 | 10/09/1958 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1960 | 30/07/1960 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1907 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21884 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
04/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1925. Dep: 06/06/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6511 |
||
02/06/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
06/06/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
11/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
02/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1927. Dep: 09/08/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1363 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1929. Dep: 10/09/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1947 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1931. Dep: 06/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1072 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1933. Dep: 30/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1935. Dep: 19/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1880 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1937. Dep: 04/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1443 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1939. Dep: 25/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1276 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1942. Dep: 31/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
27/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3395 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1065 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3800 |
||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
03/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1948. Dep: 11/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3343 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63800 |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
17/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1950. Dep: 14/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22117 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1952. Dep: 27/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22888 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1954. Dep: 11/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22272 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1957. Dep: 22/06/1957. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28934 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/08/1958. Dep: 10/09/1958. | ||
17/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/06/1960. Dep: 30/07/1960. | ||
16/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63800 from Langwith Junction (41J) |