|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 09/02/1924 | 16/02/1924 | 8 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6281 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1924 | 24/07/1924 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 1445 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1926 | 04/02/1927 | 61 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1929 | 20/06/1929 | 116 days | General | Boiler number 1473 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1931 | 29/08/1931 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 1501 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1933 | 13/01/1934 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 1385 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/11/1935 | 06/12/1935 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 1011 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/11/1937 | 18/12/1937 | 22 days | General | Altered chimney Boiler number 867 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1940 | 13/07/1940 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 3405 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 14/09/1942 | 27/11/1942 | 75 days | General | Boiler number 3328 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1944 | 29/04/1944 | 90 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5011 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/04/1945 | 28/04/1945 | 24 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/11/1946 | 04/01/1947 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 5015 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/04/1949 | 05/05/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 5007 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63802 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/09/1951 | 20/10/1951 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28355 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1951 | 02/11/1951 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1953 | 09/01/1954 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28813 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1956 | 13/10/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28343 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/09/1958 | 04/10/1958 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1960 | 16/11/1960 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28941 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1910 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21887 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
07/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
09/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 16/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6281 |
||
16/02/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
13/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
19/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1924. Dep: 24/07/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1445 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1926. Dep: 04/02/1927. | ||
25/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1929. Dep: 20/06/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1473 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1931. Dep: 29/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1501 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1933. Dep: 13/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1385 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/01/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
07/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1935. Dep: 06/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1011 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1937. Dep: 18/12/1937. Work undertaken: Altered chimney Boiler number 867 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1940. Dep: 13/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3405 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1942. Dep: 27/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3328 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1944. Dep: 29/04/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5011 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
07/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
05/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1945. Dep: 28/04/1945. | ||
06/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3802 | ||
19/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1946. Dep: 04/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5015 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1949. Dep: 05/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5007 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63802 |
||
18/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
24/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
13/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1951. Dep: 20/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28355 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/10/1951. Dep: 02/11/1951. | ||
15/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1953. Dep: 09/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28813 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1956. Dep: 13/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28343 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) | ||
23/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/09/1958. Dep: 04/10/1958. | ||
03/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
13/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1960. Dep: 16/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28941 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
12/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
14/10/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
23/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63802 from Frodingham (36C) |