|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 30/04/1927 | 30/07/1927 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6599 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/10/1929 | 09/11/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1932 | 21/05/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 809 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1935 | 08/06/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1937 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1937 | 19/06/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1939 | 14/10/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/09/1941 | 20/09/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3372 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 734 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1911 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21888 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
30/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1927. Dep: 30/07/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6599 |
||
26/07/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
26/07/1927 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
12/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1929. Dep: 09/11/1929. | ||
07/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1932. Dep: 21/05/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 809 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/01/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
25/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1935. Dep: 08/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1937 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/02/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
05/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1937. Dep: 19/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1939. Dep: 14/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3372 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 734 |
||
19/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 734 from Annesley (ANN) |