Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 164 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6553 Week
» 26995 Month
» 363841 Year
» 1585406 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1915 m/e 05/1918
London and North Western Railway 2884 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6601   17/02/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3806   03/08/1946
British Railways 63806 w/e 13/01/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/305/1918
O112/08/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21892
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 15/03/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/11/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 44 yrs, 6 mths , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Into Derby for cutting up 10/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1918
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
CLK Colwick on 15/03/1928
DON Doncaster on 23/01/1944
THJ Thornton Junction on 30/08/1944
ANN Annesley on 23/01/1949
   Withdrawn w/e 24/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 29/01/1949
LOAN 16D Annesley on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 24/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 857)
06/12/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1403)
22/07/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1021)
16/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 871)
13/08/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3245)
13/08/1938 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
11/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3428)
12/08/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5006)
11/08/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5008)
31/12/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5051)
06/01/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28283)
09/05/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28265)
21/05/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28838)
23/03/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28391)
15/05/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28459)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 17/12/1927 17/03/1928 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6601
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1930 06/12/1930 15 days General
Boiler number 1403 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/07/1933 22/07/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/11/1935 16/11/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 871 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1938 13/08/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3245 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 04/01/1941 11/01/1941 8 days General
Boiler number 3428 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1943 22/05/1943 12 days General  
Gorton Works 03/06/1944 12/08/1944 71 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5006 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1946 11/08/1946 49 days General
Boiler number 5008 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3806
 
Gorton Works 17/11/1948 31/12/1948 45 days General
Boiler number 5051 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63806
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1950 06/01/1951 73 days General
Boiler number 28283 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1951 17/01/1951 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 08/04/1951 21/04/1951 14 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 04/03/1952 03/05/1952 61 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 17/04/1953 09/05/1953 23 days General
Boiler number 28265 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1954 10/07/1954 40 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 12/04/1955 21/05/1955 40 days General
Boiler number 28838 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1957 23/03/1957 30 days General
Boiler number 28391 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1959 18/09/1959 32 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 20/01/1961 11/02/1961 23 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 28/03/1962 15/05/1962 49 days General
Boiler number 28459 (Diagram 100A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1946 General An interesting double-headed train is the 5.30 p.m. Clacton, which daily leaves with any combination of 'D.16/2,' 'D.16/3,' 'B.12/3,' and 'B.17' at the head. Spitalflelds goods has not seen very many strangers, but 3806 (6601) was a change recently. 'F.3' are still seen at Liverpool Street; locos noted being 7139 (8067), 7148 (8047), 7149 (8048), and 8081, all on the Woodford line fairly regularly between the end of June till October. This line also has had 'V.1' 7675 working along it late Sept./Oct., together with various 0-6-0Ts such as 8575, 8612, 8613, and 8633. The Ilford line usually gets the 'J.68' such as 7043 25/9 and 7048 28/8, whilst even the sparse Fenchurch Street service comes in for its share (8538 noted 30/11). The most usual 'J.15' in Liverpool Street are:-7545/6/7/60/5/6, 7641/4/6 and 5453 (7555), and they usually turn up on Brentwood or Gidea Park trains SLS/194701
31/10/1962 Annesley MPD The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1915
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21892
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2884    
08/1921 Allocation      
17/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1927. Dep: 17/03/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6601
   
15/03/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
15/03/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
22/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1930. Dep: 06/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1403 (Diagram 15)
   
15/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1933. Dep: 22/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15)
   
02/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1935. Dep: 16/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 871 (Diagram 15)
   
30/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1938. Dep: 13/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3245 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
04/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1941. Dep: 11/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3428 (Diagram 15)
   
11/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1943. Dep: 22/05/1943.    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
03/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1944. Dep: 12/08/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5006 (Diagram 100A)
   
30/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ)    
24/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1946. Dep: 11/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5008 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3806
   
17/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1948. Dep: 31/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5051 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63806
   
23/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
26/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1950. Dep: 06/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28283 (Diagram 100A)
   
10/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/01/1951. Dep: 17/01/1951.    
08/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/04/1951. Dep: 21/04/1951.    
04/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/03/1952. Dep: 03/05/1952.    
17/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1953. Dep: 09/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28265 (Diagram 100A)
   
01/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/06/1954. Dep: 10/07/1954.    
12/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1955. Dep: 21/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28838 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1957. Dep: 23/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28391 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 18/08/1959. Dep: 18/09/1959.    
20/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/01/1961. Dep: 11/02/1961.    
28/03/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1962. Dep: 15/05/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28459 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63806 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev