Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 108 Today
» 936 Yesterday
» 2969 Week
» 20305 Month
» 298101 Year
» 1182482 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1916 m/e 05/1918
LNWR 2871 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6518   31/10/1925
LNER (1946) 3807   14/07/1946
BR 63807 w/e 02/09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/305/1918
O4/808/11/1952
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21893
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 31/10/1925
Withdrawal Fri 25/09/1964 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield)
Service Life 46 yrs, 4 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Smiths, Ecclesfield, 11/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 29/10/1925
WFD Woodford Halse 13/11/1925
KEA Keadby 10/10/1929
IMM Immingham 09/04/1932
FRO Frodingham 11/06/1932
DON Doncaster 07/04/1946
MEX Mexborough 18/08/1946
40E Langwith Junction 02/07/1950
40B Immingham 02/12/1951
40E Langwith Junction 15/03/1953
40B Immingham 07/06/1953
38A Colwick 20/09/1953
39A Gorton 21/03/1954
36C Frodingham 22/08/1954
   Withdrawn 25/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 39A Gorton 5w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 11/09/1954
WDN   25/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1028)
02/03/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1857)
19/03/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1218)
10/05/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1121)
24/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1112)
25/03/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3363)
12/07/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1837)
15/05/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1876)
17/03/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3360)
15/10/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1259)
26/08/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3329)
08/11/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28837)
20/08/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28827)
23/03/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28274)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 27/08/1925 31/10/1925 66 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6518
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1927 02/03/1928 86 days General
Boiler number 1857 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/07/1929 20/08/1929 51 days General  
Gorton Works 14/02/1932 19/03/1932 35 days General
Boiler number 1218 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1934 10/05/1934 32 days General
Boiler number 1121 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1936 24/07/1936 19 days General
Boiler number 1112 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1939 25/03/1939 52 days General
Boiler number 3363 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1941 12/07/1941 47 days General
Boiler number 1837 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/04/1943 15/05/1943 45 days General
Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/02/1945 17/03/1945 35 days General
Boiler number 3360 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1947 15/10/1947 53 days General
Boiler number 1259 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/08/1950 26/08/1950 26 days General
Boiler number 3329 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63807
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1952 08/11/1952 29 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28837 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1954 20/08/1954 44 days General
Boiler number 28827 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1955 27/08/1955 22 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 24/02/1958 23/03/1958 28 days General
Boiler number 28274 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1961 06/05/1961 31 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 07/06/1962 19/06/1962 13 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1916
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21893
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2871    
08/1921 Allocation      
27/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1925. Dep: 31/10/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6518
   
29/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
31/10/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
13/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
08/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1927. Dep: 02/03/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1857 (Diagram 15)
   
01/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1929. Dep: 20/08/1929.    
10/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
14/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1932. Dep: 19/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1218 (Diagram 15)
   
09/04/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
11/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
09/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1934. Dep: 10/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1121 (Diagram 15)
   
06/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1936. Dep: 24/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1112 (Diagram 15)
   
02/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1939. Dep: 25/03/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3363 (Diagram 15)
   
27/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1941. Dep: 12/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1837 (Diagram 15)
   
01/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15)
   
11/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1945. Dep: 17/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3360 (Diagram 15)
   
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
14/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3807    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
24/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1947. Dep: 15/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1259 (Diagram 15)
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
01/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1950. Dep: 26/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3329 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63807
   
02/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
11/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1952. Dep: 08/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28837 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
07/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
21/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
08/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1954. Dep: 20/08/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28827 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
06/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/08/1955. Dep: 27/08/1955.    
24/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1958. Dep: 23/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28274 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/04/1961. Dep: 06/05/1961.    
07/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1962. Dep: 19/06/1962.    
25/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63807 from Frodingham (36C)    
08/11/1964 Sightings A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed John Thickitt Link

prev prev