|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 27/08/1925 | 31/10/1925 | 66 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6518 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/12/1927 | 02/03/1928 | 86 days | General | Boiler number 1857 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/07/1929 | 20/08/1929 | 51 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/02/1932 | 19/03/1932 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 1218 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1934 | 10/05/1934 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 1121 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/07/1936 | 24/07/1936 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 1112 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/02/1939 | 25/03/1939 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 3363 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1941 | 12/07/1941 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 1837 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/04/1943 | 15/05/1943 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/02/1945 | 17/03/1945 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3360 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1947 | 15/10/1947 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 1259 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1950 | 26/08/1950 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3329 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63807 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1952 | 08/11/1952 | 29 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28837 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/07/1954 | 20/08/1954 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28827 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1955 | 27/08/1955 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1958 | 23/03/1958 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28274 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/04/1961 | 06/05/1961 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1962 | 19/06/1962 | 13 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1916 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21893 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2871 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
27/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1925. Dep: 31/10/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6518 |
||
29/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
31/10/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
13/11/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
08/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1927. Dep: 02/03/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1857 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1929. Dep: 20/08/1929. | ||
10/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
14/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1932. Dep: 19/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1218 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/04/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
11/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
09/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1934. Dep: 10/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1121 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1936. Dep: 24/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1112 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1939. Dep: 25/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3363 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1941. Dep: 12/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1837 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1945. Dep: 17/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3360 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
14/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3807 | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
24/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1947. Dep: 15/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1259 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
01/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1950. Dep: 26/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3329 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63807 |
||
02/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
29/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
11/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1952. Dep: 08/11/1952. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28837 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
07/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
21/03/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
08/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1954. Dep: 20/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28827 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/08/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
06/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/08/1955. Dep: 27/08/1955. | ||
24/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1958. Dep: 23/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28274 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/04/1961. Dep: 06/05/1961. | ||
07/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1962. Dep: 19/06/1962. | ||
25/09/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63807 from Frodingham (36C) |