|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/12/1925 | 20/02/1926 | 57 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6519 |
||
Gorton Works | 15/10/1927 | 26/11/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/12/1929 | 18/01/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1301 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/09/1931 | 17/10/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 818 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1934 | 07/04/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/05/1936 | 23/05/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1938 | 18/06/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1940 | 24/08/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1252 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1942 | 26/09/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3206 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1944 | 10/02/1945 | 78 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5024 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/08/1947 | 20/09/1947 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 5043 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/09/1948 | 25/09/1948 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 19/10/1949 | 12/11/1949 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 5031 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63808 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/09/1950 | 21/09/1950 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1951 | 23/02/1952 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 28373 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/02/1952 | 27/02/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1952 | 01/05/1952 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1954 | 27/03/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28362 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/11/1954 | 04/12/1954 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1955 | 26/03/1955 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 05/04/1956 | 12/05/1956 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28303 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1957 | 09/02/1957 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 16/01/1959 | 21/02/1959 | 37 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 07/09/1961 | 14/10/1961 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28886 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1962 | Annesley MPD | The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. | SLS/196212 |
14/08/1963 | Crewe Works (Scrap Road) | Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1073, D1550-58 UC (in various stages), D202/24/32/36/87, D316, 46230, 46442, 44812/96, 44936, 45070/94, 45310/40, 45421/31, 48121/64, 48766, 70018/50, 73166, 90384, 92014/56/83/105/113/133/154/167/173/191. Outside Erecting Shop: 44674, 45414/51, 48409, 82038, 12134/240. Stripped down in Yard: 92084/132/151/162. Dismantling Shed: 49448, 64791, 64907, 90095. On Scrap Road: 63808/17/65. Yard: D215/98, D338/344, 42151, 44826/909/81, 45218/305/398, 48035/133/296/751/770, 70004/21, 73025, 75000, 84012, 92100. Electric and Diesel Shop: 26057, 27002/4. Paint Shop: D1069/70/71/72, 45295, 45573, 49395, 26010, 1439 and Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D227/90, D335/79, D8007/21, 45283, 48502/618/709, 70020, 92020/40/86/123/192. On 21st July, Royal Scot 46151 was in the dismantling shed being broken-up, and 46152 was in the erecting shop having a casual. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1917 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21894 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2892 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
26/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1925. Dep: 20/02/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6519 |
||
18/02/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
20/02/1926 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
06/03/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
24/04/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
15/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1927. Dep: 26/11/1927. | ||
21/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1929. Dep: 18/01/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1301 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1931. Dep: 17/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 818 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1934. Dep: 07/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1936. Dep: 23/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
04/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1940. Dep: 24/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1252 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3206 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
25/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 10/02/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5024 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/02/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3808 | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
03/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1947. Dep: 20/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5043 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/09/1948. Dep: 25/09/1948. | ||
19/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1949. Dep: 12/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5031 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63808 |
||
16/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
19/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/09/1950. Dep: 21/09/1950. | ||
31/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1951. Dep: 23/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28373 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1952. Dep: 27/02/1952. | ||
13/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1952. Dep: 01/05/1952. | ||
25/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1954. Dep: 27/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28362 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/11/1954. Dep: 04/12/1954. | ||
21/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/02/1955. Dep: 26/03/1955. | ||
05/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1956. Dep: 12/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28303 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/01/1957. Dep: 09/02/1957. | ||
16/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 16/01/1959. Dep: 21/02/1959. | ||
07/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1961. Dep: 14/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28886 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63808 from Annesley (16D) |