Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 828 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3388 Week
» 16421 Month
» 238822 Year
» 1123203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1921 m/e 05/1918
LNER (1924) 6603   28/01/1928
War Dept. 789   18/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21898
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 21/01/1928
Withdrawal Sat 18/10/1941 off Staveley (G.C.) (STV)
Service Life 23 yrs, 5 mths , 18 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 789 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 21/01/1928
STV Staveley (G.C.) 09/02/1934
   Withdrawn 18/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1249)
02/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1938)
01/12/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1956)
02/02/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1865)
06/03/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3276)
29/07/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1287)
18/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3420)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 08/10/1927 28/01/1928 113 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6603
 
Gorton Works 15/02/1930 15/03/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 18/06/1932 02/07/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1938 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/11/1934 01/12/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1956 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/01/1935 02/02/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 1865 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/02/1937 06/03/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 3276 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/07/1939 29/07/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1287 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1941 18/10/1941 17 days General
Boiler number 3420 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 789
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1921
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21898
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
08/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1927. Dep: 28/01/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6603
   
21/01/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
21/01/1928 To Stock To ROD stock    
15/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1930. Dep: 15/03/1930.    
18/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1932. Dep: 02/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1938 (Diagram 15)
   
09/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
17/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1934. Dep: 01/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1956 (Diagram 15)
   
26/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1935. Dep: 02/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1865 (Diagram 15)
   
27/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1937. Dep: 06/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3276 (Diagram 15)
   
15/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1939. Dep: 29/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1287 (Diagram 15)
   
02/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1941. Dep: 18/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3420 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 789
   
18/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 789 from Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    

prev prev